This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/05/2021 at 15:54:26 (UTC).

VAHAN YOGHOURDJIAN VS GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 VAHAN YOGHOURDJIAN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3207

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YOGHOURDJIAN VAHAN

Defendant

GENERAL MOTORS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ASLANIAN ARAM E.

KASPARIAN LUCY

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/23/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/23/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/22/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2021
  • Hearing10/01/2021 at 10:15 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • Hearing09/02/2021 at 11:45 AM in Department 62 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Vahan Yoghourdjian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vahan Yoghourdjian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Vahan Yoghourdjian (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASLANIAN ARAM ERIC

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KASPARIAN LUCY