This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/30/2020 at 01:40:36 (UTC).

VAHAG HAKOBYAN VS MARTIN FUHRMAN

Case Summary

On 04/11/2018 VAHAG HAKOBYAN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against MARTIN FUHRMAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1752

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

HAKOBYAN VAHAG

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 50

FUHRMAN MARTIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BROCK CAMERON Y. ESQ.

KENNEDY SCOTT A.

BROCK CAMERON YADIDI ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

GATES O'DOHERTY GONTER & GUY LLP

GLANTZ JASON MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

9/28/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

4/28/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)]

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

4/3/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/03/2020

4/3/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/03/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

12/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL)

Motion to Continue Trial Date

11/8/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

Motion to Continue Trial Date

11/8/2019: Motion to Continue Trial Date

[Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

8/13/2019: [Proposed Order] and Stipulation to Continue Trial, FSC (and Related Motion/Discovery Dates) Person - [PROPOSED ORDER] AND STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL, FSC (AND RELATED MOTION/DISCOVERY DATES) PERSO

Association of Attorney - ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

6/13/2019: Association of Attorney - ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE

9/19/2018: NOTICE OF NAME CHANGE

NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

6/8/2018: NOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

ANSWER

6/8/2018: ANSWER

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

6/8/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

CIVIL DEPOSIT -

6/8/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT -

PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

4/26/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS -

SUMMONS -

4/11/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

4/11/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • Hearing04/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • Hearing03/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 27 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([Minute Order (Court Order)]); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 27, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order) of 04/03/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketReceipt; Filed by Martin Fuhrman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by Martin Fuhrman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Martin Fuhrman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Martin Fuhrman (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSIT OF JURY FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Vahag Hakobyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vahag Hakobyan (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC701752    Hearing Date: December 13, 2019    Dept: 4B

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

On April 11, 2018, plaintiff Vahag Hakobyan filed this action against defendant Martin Fuhrman. Defendant moves to continue trial by three months from February 19, 2020 to May 25, 2020 so that discovery may continue. Plaintiff does not oppose this motion.

A party seeking a continuance of the date set for trial must make the request for a continuance by a noticed motion or an ex parte application as soon as reasonably practical once the necessity for the continuance is discovered. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332(b).) The request for continuance may be granted on an affirmative showing of good cause. (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.1332.)

Based on the matters presented, the Court finds good cause to continue the trial from February 19, 2020 to May 27, 2020. The Final Status Conference is also continued from January 31, 2020 to May 13, 2020, with all discovery and motion cut off dates to be based on the new trial date.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.