This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/15/2019 at 10:17:06 (UTC).

VAEDYNN ERLANDSON VS ADVANCED NUTRIENTS US LLC ET AL

Case Summary

On 06/13/2017 VAEDYNN ERLANDSON filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against ADVANCED NUTRIENTS US LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL and DENNIS J. LANDIN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4883

  • Filing Date:

    06/13/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MICHAEL J. RAPHAEL

DENNIS J. LANDIN

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

ERLANDSON VAEDYNN

Defendants and Respondents

LAL ROMAN DR

STRAUMIETIS MIKE

DOES 1 TO 20

ADVANCED NUTRIENTS US LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorney

SZMANDA BRETT D.

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

NELSON HARDIMAN LLP

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

BAKER BURTON & LUNDY A PROF. CORP

DAWSON STEVEN JAMES

Other Attorneys

MOSER JANA MARIE

SZMANDA BRETT DONALD

 

Court Documents

DECLARATIONS OF STEVEN J. DAWSON AND LAUREN D. FIERO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION DEEMING FACTS ADMITTED

2/1/2018: DECLARATIONS OF STEVEN J. DAWSON AND LAUREN D. FIERO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION DEEMING FACTS ADMITTED

PROOF OF SERVICE

2/1/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, PENALTIES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF

2/1/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, PENALTIES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION DEEMING FACTS ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN AWARD OF

2/1/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION DEEMING FACTS ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN AWARD OF

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN AWARD OF MONETARY SA

2/1/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN AWARD OF MONETARY SA

DECLARATIONS OF STEVEN J. DAWSON AND LAUREN D. FIERO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO

2/1/2018: DECLARATIONS OF STEVEN J. DAWSON AND LAUREN D. FIERO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO

DECLARATIONS OF STEVEN J. DAWSON AND LAUREN D. FIERO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO

2/1/2018: DECLARATIONS OF STEVEN J. DAWSON AND LAUREN D. FIERO IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS? MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO

MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN AWARD OF MON

2/1/2018: MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES BY DEFENDANT ADVANCED NUTRIENTS IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF?S DISCOVERY MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION; NOTICE OF REQUEST FOR AN AWARD OF MON

AMENDED PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

2/5/2018: AMENDED PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE

DECLARATION OF MATT GUSTIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

2/6/2018: DECLARATION OF MATT GUSTIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

REPLY TO DEFENDANT ADVANCED'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMOPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

2/6/2018: REPLY TO DEFENDANT ADVANCED'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMOPELLING RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

DECLARATION OF MATT GUSTIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING FACTS ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

2/6/2018: DECLARATION OF MATT GUSTIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING FACTS ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

PROOF OF SERVICE

2/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

DECLARATION OF MATT GUSTIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

2/6/2018: DECLARATION OF MATT GUSTIN IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

PROOF OF SERVICE

2/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE

2/6/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE

REPLY TO DEFENDANT ADVANCED'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING FACTS ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

2/6/2018: REPLY TO DEFENDANT ADVANCED'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER DEEMING FACTS ADMITTED AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

REPLY TO DEFENDANT ADVANCED'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

2/6/2018: REPLY TO DEFENDANT ADVANCED'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS

149 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2019
  • Hearingat 09:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Post-Mediation Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 51 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Adjudication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2019
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Party's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 51, Dennis J. Landin, Presiding; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (For Order Continuing Hearings on Motions for Summary Adjudication) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application For Order Continuing Hearings...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • DocketEx Parte Application (For Order Continuing Hearings on Motions for Summary Adjudication); Filed by Vaedynn Erlandson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
206 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Vaedynn Erlandson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Vaedynn Erlandson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Vaedynn Erlandson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Vaedynn Erlandson (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES, PENALTIES, INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND OTHER EQUITABLE RELIEF CAUSES OF ACTION 1) VIOLATION OF CALIFORNIA GOVERNMENT CODE 12940(A) (GENETIC DISCRIMINATION); ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****4883    Hearing Date: October 25, 2019    Dept: 51

Defendant's unopposed ex parte application to dismiss PAGA cause of action is granted. 


related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADVANCED NUTRIENTS US LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SZMANDA BRETT D.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSER JANA