This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/28/2021 at 16:43:52 (UTC).

VACHIK AIVAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL VS ARCONIC INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 VACHIK AIVAZ, AN INDIVIDUAL filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against ARCONIC INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is STEPHEN P. PFAHLER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0728

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

STEPHEN P. PFAHLER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIVAZ AN INDIVIDUAL VACHIK

Defendants

VALLEY-TODECO INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

GOLDINA AN INDIVIDUAL LANA

ORELLANA AN INDIVIDUAL NATE

VILLA AN INDIVIDUAL JOAQUIN

ARCONIC INC. DBA ARCONIC FASTENING SYSTEMS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MESRIANI RODNEY

Defendant Attorney

MILLER MICHELE BALLARD

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement

4/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

4/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

4/19/2021: Case Management Order

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

3/10/2021: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Answer

3/19/2021: Answer

Case Management Statement

3/19/2021: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/19/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

1/26/2021: Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt

Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

1/15/2021: Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information

Answer

1/5/2021: Answer

Answer

1/5/2021: Answer

Proof of Personal Service

12/3/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/9/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/19/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • Hearing03/03/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F49 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department F49, Stephen P. Pfahler, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Howmet Aerospace Inc. Erroneously Sued As ARCONIC INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by JOAQUIN VILLA, an Individual (Defendant); NATE ORELLANA, an Individual (Defendant); LANA GOLDINA, an Individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by VACHIK AIVAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by VACHIK AIVAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VACHIK AIVAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Howmet Aerospace Inc. Erroneously Sued As ARCONIC INC. (Defendant); VALLEY-TODECO, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Howmet Aerospace Inc. Erroneously Sued As ARCONIC INC. (Defendant); VALLEY-TODECO, INC., a California Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VACHIK AIVAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by VACHIK AIVAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by VACHIK AIVAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by VACHIK AIVAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by VACHIK AIVAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by VACHIK AIVAZ, an Individual (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Arconic Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESRIANI RODNEY