This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/01/2022 at 15:43:15 (UTC).

UVALDO SANCHEZ, VS BORRMANN METAL CENTER

Case Summary

On 10/27/2022 UVALDO SANCHEZ, filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against BORRMANN METAL CENTER. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III and MAREN NELSON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4521

  • Filing Date:

    10/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

DAVID S. CUNNINGHAM III

MAREN NELSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANCHEZ UVALDO

Defendant

BORRMANN METAL CENTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AIWAZIAN EDWIN

 

Court Documents

Complaint

10/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

10/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

10/27/2022: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

10/27/2022: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

10/27/2022: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

11/8/2022: Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 11/10/2022

11/10/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE) OF 11/10/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

11/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 11/29/2022

11/29/2022: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;) OF 11/29/2022

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

11/29/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE. CASE REASSIGNMENT;)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 9 - Hon. Yvette M. Palazuelos; Reason: Other

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order Re. Case Reassignment;)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re. Case Reassignment;) of 11/29/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketMinute Order (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Court Order re: Peremptory Challenge) of 11/10/2022; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): Filed By: Uvaldo Sanchez, (Plaintiff); Result: Granted; Result Date: 11/09/2022; As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketCase reassigned to Spring Street Courthouse in Department 11 - Hon. David S. Cunningham III; Reason: Challenge / Recusal, by Plaintiff

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by: Uvaldo Sanchez, (Plaintiff); Judge Name: Maren E. Nelson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Challenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6): As To Parties: removed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maren Nelson in Department 17 Spring Street Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Uvaldo Sanchez, (Plaintiff); As to: Borrmann Metal Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Uvaldo Sanchez, (Plaintiff); As to: Borrmann Metal Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Uvaldo Sanchez, (Plaintiff); As to: Borrmann Metal Center (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Provisionally Complex Case Type

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Class Action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BORRMANN METAL CENTER INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AIWAZIAN EDWIN