This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 19:25:56 (UTC).

UULALA, INC. VS DAMIANO RAIGOZA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 UULALA, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAMIANO RAIGOZA,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SAMANTHA JESSNER, RUTH ANN KWAN and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8345

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SAMANTHA JESSNER

RUTH ANN KWAN

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UULALA INC.

Defendants

SHEU ALLAN

RAIGOZA DAMIANO

URENA ANDRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WATKINS STEPHEN A

KAMINSKI DAVID J.

Defendant Attorneys

ENSBERG LARSEN E.

BARANOV MICHAEL MARK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

7/14/2022: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

5/16/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

5/19/2022: Notice of Ruling

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LARSEN ENSBERG IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR

5/19/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LARSEN ENSBERG IN RESPONSE TO OSC RE: FAILURE TO APPEAR

Notice of Ruling

1/3/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

1/13/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/15/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $2,502.50; DECLARATION OF LARSEN E. ENSBERG

6/22/2021: Motion to Compel - MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET NO. ONE, AND FOR MONETARY SANCTIONS OF $2,502.50; DECLARATION OF LARSEN E. ENSBERG

Separate Statement

6/22/2021: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

7/2/2021: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

7/2/2021: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHEN A. WATKINS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

8/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHEN A. WATKINS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANK DISCRISI IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPE RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

8/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANK DISCRISI IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPE RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

8/5/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE

Separate Statement

8/5/2021: Separate Statement

Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHEN A. WATKINS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO

8/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF STEPHEN A. WATKINS IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO

Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANK DISCRISI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

8/5/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF FRANK DISCRISI IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO

8/5/2021: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES AND FURTHER PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS DEFENDANTS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET TWO

69 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Trial Setting Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Order to Show Cause Re: (Counsel for Defendant Damiano Raigoza's Failure to Appear on May 16, 2022) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68; Order to Show Cause Re: (Counsel for Defendant Damiano Raigoza's Failure to Appear on May 16, 2022) - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Larsen Ensberg in Response to OSC Re: Failure to Appear); Filed by Damiano Raigoza (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Trial Setting Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Trial Setting Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Allan Sheu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANT ALLAN SHEU?S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Allan Sheu (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order; Memorandum in Support Of); Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Marcial Landa in Support of Application for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less