This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2021 at 16:48:11 (UTC).

UULALA, INC. VS DAMIANO RAIGOZA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/14/2020 UULALA, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DAMIANO RAIGOZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GREGORY KEOSIAN, SAMANTHA JESSNER, RUTH ANN KWAN and MARK V. MOONEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8345

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

GREGORY KEOSIAN

SAMANTHA JESSNER

RUTH ANN KWAN

MARK V. MOONEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UULALA INC.

Defendants

SHEU ALLAN

RAIGOZA DAMIANO

URENA ANDRE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WATKINS STEPHEN A

KAMINSKI DAVID J.

Defendant Attorneys

BARANOV MICHAEL MARK

ENSBERG LARSEN E.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

11/16/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

11/10/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

10/28/2020: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

10/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE UNDER CCP SECTION 425.16 ...)

Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S ANTI-SLAPP AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

10/1/2020: Reply - REPLY TO PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S ANTI-SLAPP AND SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE

Declaration - DECLARATION OF LARSEN E. ENBERG IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION)

7/27/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF LARSEN E. ENBERG IN SUPPORT OF SPECIAL MOTION TO STRIKE (ANTI-SLAPP MOTION)

Request for Dismissal

7/30/2020: Request for Dismissal

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

7/13/2020: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

6/15/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice - NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

6/16/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT ALLAN SHEUS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

6/5/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT ALLAN SHEUS OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 06/08/2020

6/8/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;) OF 06/08/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, UULALA, INC., FOR TEMPORAR...)

6/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (EX PARTE APPLICATION OF PLAINTIFF, UULALA, INC., FOR TEMPORAR...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

6/8/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE: PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE TO JUDICIAL OFFICER;)

Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

5/15/2020: Declaration in Support of Ex Parte Application

Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MARCIAL LANDA IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

5/15/2020: Affidavit - AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVIT OF MARCIAL LANDA IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER

Complaint

5/14/2020: Complaint

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2021
  • Hearing12/13/2021 at 09:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • Hearing12/03/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 68 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Damiano Raigoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Damiano Raigoza (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • Docketat 10:30 AM in Department 68, Mark V. Mooney, Presiding; Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 (Anti-SLAPP motion) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Special Motion to Strike under CCP Section 425.16 ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketOrder Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore (Alicia Renee Desmond 13037); Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketChallenge To Judicial Officer - Peremptory (170.6); Filed by Allan Sheu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANT ALLAN SHEU?S OPPOSITION TO EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT THEREOF); Filed by Allan Sheu (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (re: Notice of Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketEx Parte Application (Ex Parte Application for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order; Memorandum in Support Of); Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Ex Parte Application; Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • DocketAffidavit (Affidavit of Marcial Landa in Support of Application for Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order); Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Uulala, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UULALA INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WATKINS STEPHEN A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KAMINSKI DAVID J.