Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/03/2021 at 07:53:30 (UTC).

U.S. BANK TRUST, N.A., AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST VS NICHOLAS COLACHIS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 U S BANK TRUST, N A , AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against NICHOLAS COLACHIS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2678

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK TRUST N.A. AS TRUSTEE FOR LSF9 MASTER PARTICIPATION TRUST

Defendants

REBAR ENGINEERING INC.

COLACHIS SAM JR.

DEUTSCHE MELLON NATIONAL ASSET LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

NOTTOLI VICTOR

LOOKOUT MOUNTAIN PARTNERSHIP

FRANCHISE STATE TAX BOARD OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

GRISWOLD KENNETH

COLACHIS NICHOLAS A.

COLACHIS SAM III

SAL CONSTRUCTION

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A.

DEUTSCHE MELLON NATIONAL ASSET LLC

JPMORGAN CHASE BANK N.A. EXCUSED FROM PROCEEDINGS BY STIPULATION AND ORDER ON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAZI-JAFARI JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

5/25/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/3/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

3/16/2021: Demurrer - with Motion to Strike (CCP 430.10)

Case Management Statement

3/22/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/25/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Proof of Service by Mail

2/17/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER

2/3/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF ORDER

Proof of Service by Mail

1/19/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2020

4/29/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 04/29/2020

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

3/16/2020: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Case Management Statement

3/5/2020: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/5/2020: Case Management Statement

Declaration re: Due Diligence

11/27/2019: Declaration re: Due Diligence

Request for Dismissal

11/12/2019: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/13/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Case Management Statement

11/12/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Lis Pendens

10/3/2019: Notice of Lis Pendens

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/12/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • Hearing08/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • Hearing08/17/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • DocketNotice of Lis Pendens; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., as Trustee for LSF9 Master Participation Trust (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SAL CONSTRUCTION is a litigant

Latest cases where REBAR ENGINEERING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where DEUTSCHE MELLON NATIONAL ASSET LLC A WYOMING LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant