This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/17/2022 at 10:27:58 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS RRS TRUCKING, INC., A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/27/2022 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RRS TRUCKING, INC , A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0691

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION DBA U.S. BANK EQUIPMENT FINANCE

Defendants

KHACHIKYAN ARTSRUN

North Hollywood, CA 91605

RRS TRUCKING INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROSS BARBARA R.

 

Court Documents

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

9/30/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

9/30/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/27/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/27/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

9/27/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/27/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/14/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

11/21/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION OF TERRICA VORVICK IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/2/2022: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - DECLARATION OF TERRICA VORVICK IN SUPPORT OF REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Summary of the Case - SUMMARY OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1800

12/2/2022: Summary of the Case - SUMMARY OF THE CASE PURSUANT TO CRC 3.1800

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/2/2022: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

12/2/2022: Request for Dismissal - REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL - PARTIAL

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

12/2/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Declaration - STANDARD AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

12/2/2022: Declaration - STANDARD AFFIDAVIT REGARDING MILITARY SERVICE

Judgment - JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

12/5/2022: Judgment - JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT BY COURT

Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

12/6/2022: Notice - NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: RRS Trucking, Inc., a suspended California corporation (Defendant); Artsrun Khachikyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Issued by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: RRS Trucking, Inc., a suspended California corporation (Defendant); Artsrun Khachikyan (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketJudgment by Default by Court; Issued and Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: RRS Trucking, Inc., a suspended California corporation (Defendant); Artsrun Khachikyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff U.S. Bank National Association DBA U.S. Bank Equipment Finance against Defendant RRS Trucking, Inc., a suspended California corporation and Defendant Artsrun Khachikyan on the Complaint filed by U.S. Bank National Association on 09/27/2022 for damages of $74,561.03, attorney fees of $2,381.22, interest of $2,615.04, and costs of $620.03 for a total of $80,177.32.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment by Default by Court: Status changed from Issued and Filed to Signed and Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: RRS Trucking, Inc., a suspended California corporation (Defendant); Artsrun Khachikyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketStandard Affidavit Regarding Military Service; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketSummary of the Case Pursuant to CRC 3.1800; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketDue to Clerical Error, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Clerical Error was rescheduled to 12/01/2022 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 02/22/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/01/2023 at 08:30 AM in Burbank Courthouse at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Frank M. Tavelman in Department A Burbank Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: RRS Trucking, Inc., a suspended California corporation (Defendant); Artsrun Khachikyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: RRS Trucking, Inc., a suspended California corporation (Defendant); Artsrun Khachikyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: RRS Trucking, Inc., a suspended California corporation (Defendant); Artsrun Khachikyan (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less