This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2022 at 15:01:34 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS KIM LOGISTICS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KIM LOGISTICS, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1284

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION DBA U.S. BANK EQUIPMENT FINANCE

Defendants

GREENIDGE KATHLEEN AKA KATHLEEN OLEETAH GREENIDGE

KIM LOGISTICS A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION FKA NEWBREED TRUCKING COMPANY INC.

OWENS IAN AKA IAN SCOTT OWENS

Hawthorne, CA 90250

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GROSS BARBARA

 

Court Documents

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/18/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/18/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/18/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

11/18/2022: Complaint

Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

11/22/2022: Order to Show Cause (Hearing)

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/22/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

12/1/2022: Proof of Personal Service - PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2023
  • Hearing06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2023
  • Hearing06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department B at 825 Maple Ave., Torrance, CA 90503; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Ian Owens (Defendant); Service Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 125.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Kim Logistics, a California corporation (Defendant); Service Date: 11/22/2022; Service Cost: 30.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketProof of Service of Summons; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Kathleen Greenidge (Defendant); Service Date: 11/29/2022; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service, Failure to Prosecute, Failure to File Case Management Conference Statement scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause (Hearing); Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Torrance Courthouse at Department B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Gary Y. Tanaka in Department B Torrance Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Kim Logistics, a California corporation (Defendant); Ian Owens (Defendant); Kathleen Greenidge (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Kim Logistics, a California corporation (Defendant); Ian Owens (Defendant); Kathleen Greenidge (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Kim Logistics, a California corporation (Defendant); Ian Owens (Defendant); Kathleen Greenidge (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GROSS BARBARA