This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/30/2023 at 11:00:15 (UTC).

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS BEVERLY WOODWARD, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/22/2023 U S BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEVERLY WOODWARD,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0822

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2023

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendants

WOODWARD BEVERLY

WOODWARD ROY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COATS DAVID M.

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/22/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/22/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/22/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/22/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

2/22/2023: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/1/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

3/1/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Dismissal

3/29/2023: Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by U.S. Bank National Association on 02/22/2023, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by U.S. Bank National Association as to the entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/29/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Woodward (Defendant); Service Date: 02/26/2023; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Roy Woodward (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 02/26/2023; Service Cost: 98.60; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Woodward (Defendant); Roy Woodward (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Woodward (Defendant); Roy Woodward (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U.S. Bank National Association (Plaintiff); As to: Beverly Woodward (Defendant); Roy Woodward (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 06/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Huey P. Cotton in Department A Van Nuys Courthouse East

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less