This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/24/2021 at 17:53:32 (UTC).

U.S. BANK, N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS ARSEN NERSISYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 U S BANK, N A , A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARSEN NERSISYAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0890

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK N.A. A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

NERSISYAN AN INDIVIDUAL ARSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D

 

Court Documents

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/26/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/7/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/7/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/7/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/7/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/8/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • Hearing11/09/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department U at 6230 Sylmar Ave., Van Nuys, CA 91401; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice (OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U.S. Bank, N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D