This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2021 at 00:23:54 (UTC).

U.S. BANK N. A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS NORMAN SCHICKEDANZ, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/23/2021 U S BANK N A , A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NORMAN SCHICKEDANZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7163

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK N. A. A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

SCHICKEDANZ AN INDIVIDUAL NORMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANLOCHEM MICHAEL D

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/2/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/2/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

8/31/2021: Request for Dismissal

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/23/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/23/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/23/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/23/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by U.S. Bank N. A., a National Association (Plaintiff); Norman Schickedanz, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U.S. Bank N. A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by U.S. Bank N. A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U.S. Bank N. A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Bank National Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VANLOCHEM MICAHEL D