This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2021 at 03:16:35 (UTC).

U.S. BANK LEASING LT, A DIVISION OF U.S. BANK N.A., A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION VS KATHRINE SHAHBAZIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 U S BANK LEASING LT, A DIVISION OF U S BANK N A , A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KATHRINE SHAHBAZIAN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Glendale Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0976

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U.S. BANK LEASING LT A DIVISION OF U.S. BANK N.A. A NATIONAL ASSOCIATION

Defendant

SHAHBAZIAN AN INDIVIDUAL KATHRINE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRUGLIAK BENTZION

 

Court Documents

Complaint

7/28/2021: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/28/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/28/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/28/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/28/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Request for Dismissal

10/21/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

10/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by U.S. Bank Leasing LT, a division of U.S. Bank N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff); Kathrine Shahbazian, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U.S. Bank Leasing LT, a division of U.S. Bank N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by U.S. Bank Leasing LT, a division of U.S. Bank N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U.S. Bank Leasing LT, a division of U.S. Bank N.A., a National Association (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRUGLIAK BENTZION