This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/02/2019 at 01:08:45 (UTC).

URIEL FRANCIS NEGADO, MINOR, BY PARENTS: GOMER MANGAHIS ARROYO AND RUTH TIBAY NEGADO-ARROYO

Case Summary

On 06/05/2019 URIEL FRANCIS NEGADO, MINOR, BY PARENTS GOMER MANGAHIS ARROYO AND RUTH TIBAY NEGADO-ARROYO was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is EDWARD B. MORETON. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2263

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

EDWARD B. MORETON

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NEGADO URIEL FRANCIS MINOR BY PARENTS: GOMER MANGAHIS ARROYO AND RUTH TIBAY NEGADO-ARROYO

Not Classified By Court

NEGADO-ARROYO RUTH TIBAY

ARROYO GOMER MANGAHIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

MOSQUEDA ROMAN P

 

Court Documents

Proof of Publication

7/9/2019: Proof of Publication

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

6/7/2019: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Petition for Change of Name

6/5/2019: Petition for Change of Name

Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

6/5/2019: Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name)

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/5/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/5/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • at 10:30 AM in Department 44, Edward B. Moreton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Name Change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Decree Changing Name; Filed by Uriel Francis T Negado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Proof of Publication; Filed by Uriel Francis T Negado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Order to Show Cause for Change of Name (Change of Name); Filed by Uriel Francis T Negado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Petition for Change of Name; Filed by Uriel Francis T Negado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Uriel Francis T Negado (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOSQUEDA ROMAN P.