This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/01/2022 at 16:04:26 (UTC).

URIBE, REINA VS URIBE, BERNARDO, JR

Case Summary

On 01/28/2022 URIBE, REINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against URIBE, BERNARDO, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILCOX, WENDY L.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0957

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WILCOX, WENDY L.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

URIBE REINA

Respondent

URIBE BERNARDO JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE

Respondent Attorney

CHROMAN STEVEN BRIAN

 

Court Documents

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

1/28/2022: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

1/28/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Summons

1/28/2022: Summons

Declaration - UCCJEA

1/28/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

1/28/2022: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Notice - Unavailability of Counsel - Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

3/23/2022: Notice - Unavailability of Counsel - Notice - Unavailability of Counsel

Minute Order

2/25/2022: Minute Order

Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

2/14/2022: Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation - Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation

Proof of Service - Proof of Service

2/14/2022: Proof of Service - Proof of Service

Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

2/14/2022: Order - Financial Information (FAM 111)

Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

2/14/2022: Declaration - UCCJEA - Declaration - UCCJEA

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

1/31/2022: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110)

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

1/31/2022: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109)

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

1/31/2022: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

1/31/2022: Request - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case)

Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

1/31/2022: Proposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order

Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

1/31/2022: Proposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketNotice - Unavailability of Counsel (Notice - Unavailability of Counsel ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department 81, Wilcox, Wendy L., Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Off Calendar - Moving Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketResponse - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation (Response - Dissolution, Nullity, Legal Separation ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA (Declaration - UCCJEA ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service (Proof of Service ); Filed by Respondent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketRequest - DV Prevention w/Minor Child (w/in Existing Case); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 110 Temporary Restraining Order; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketProposed Form 109 - Notice - Court Hearing; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketOrder - Financial Information (FAM 111)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STERNBERG CAROLINE SUE