This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2020 at 04:06:50 (UTC).

URBINA, WILMER VS GUZMAN, FRANCISCO ALFONSO

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 URBINA, WILMER filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against GUZMAN, FRANCISCO ALFONSO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1051

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

SAUCEDA, A. VERONICA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

URBINA WILMER

Respondent

GUZMAN FRANCISCO ALFONSO

 

Court Documents

Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

10/16/2020: Restraining Order After Hearing (Form 130)

Minute Order

10/16/2020: Minute Order

Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partially granted

9/25/2020: Temporary Restraining Order (Form 110) - Partially granted

Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

9/25/2020: Declaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given)

Proof of Service

9/29/2020: Proof of Service

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

9/25/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/25/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partially granted and partially denied

9/25/2020: Notice - Court Hearing (Form 109) - Partially granted and partially denied

Petition - Civil Harassment

9/25/2020: Petition - Civil Harassment

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2020
  • Docketat 8:30 AM in Department N, Sauceda, A. Veronica, Presiding; Restraining Order Hearing - Granted - RO Before Evidence by both

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketRestraining Order After Hearing (Form 130); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketProof of Service; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Ex Parte Notice (No Notice Given); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNotice - Court Hearing (Form 109) (Partially granted and partially denied ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketTemporary Restraining Order (Form 110) (Partially granted ); Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPetition - Civil Harassment; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less