This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/23/2023 at 18:59:48 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON BEHALF OF ITS VERDUGO HILLS HOSPITAL VS 1 SOURCE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 09/28/2022 UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON BEHALF OF ITS VERDUGO HILLS HOSPITAL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against 1 SOURCE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAURICE A. LEITER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1659

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAURICE A. LEITER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON BEHALF OF ITS VERDUGO HILLS HOSPITAL

Defendant

1 SOURCE BUSINESS SOLUTIONS LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHARIFI PANTEA

Defendant Attorney

HOYT ADAM L.

 

Court Documents

Answer

4/6/2023: Answer

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

3/29/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

3/23/2023: Notice - NOTICE OF REMOTE APPEARANCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; TRIAL SETTING...)

3/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON DEMURRER - WITHOUT MOTION TO STRIKE; TRIAL SETTING...)

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

3/10/2023: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

3/6/2023: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/6/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

12/22/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

12/21/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Case Management Statement

12/21/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Motion

11/23/2022: Notice of Motion

Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

11/23/2022: Demurrer - without Motion to Strike

Declaration - DECLARATION OF ADAM L. HOYT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

11/23/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF ADAM L. HOYT IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT'S DEMURRER

Proof of Personal Service

10/5/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/3/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Complaint

9/28/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

9/28/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/28/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2024
  • Hearing02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2024
  • Hearing02/09/2024 at 09:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2023
  • Hearing11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 54 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: 1 Source Business Solutions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketJury Trial (3 Day est) scheduled for 02/20/2024 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 02/09/2024 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketStatus Conference re: Alternative Dispute Resolution scheduled for 11/15/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Trial Setting Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2023
  • DocketTrial Setting Conference scheduled for 03/29/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54 updated: Result Date to 03/29/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Remote Appearance; Filed by: University of Southern California on behalf of its Verdugo Hills Hospital (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/06/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 54

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: University of Southern California on behalf of its Verdugo Hills Hospital (Plaintiff); As to: 1 Source Business Solutions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: University of Southern California on behalf of its Verdugo Hills Hospital (Plaintiff); As to: 1 Source Business Solutions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: University of Southern California on behalf of its Verdugo Hills Hospital (Plaintiff); As to: 1 Source Business Solutions, LLC (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maurice A. Leiter in Department 54 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: *******1659 Hearing Date: March 17, 2023 Dept: 54

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

University of Southern CA on behalf of its Verdugo Hills Hospital,

Plaintiff,

Case No.:

*******1659

vs.

Tentative Ruling

1 Source Business Solutions, LLC,

Defendant.

Hearing Date: March 17, 2023

Department 54, Judge Maurice A. Leiter

Demurrer to Complaint

Moving Party: Defendant 1 Source Business Solutions, LLC

Responding Party: Plaintiff University of Southern CA on behalf of its Verdugo Hills Hospital

T/R: DEFENDANT’S DEMURRER IS OVERRULED.

DEFENDANT TO FILE AND SERVE AN ANSWER TO THE COMPLAINT WITHIN 20 DAYS OF NOTICE OF RULING.

DEFENDANT TO NOTICE.

If the parties wish to submit on the tentative, please email the courtroom at SMCdept54@lacourt.org with notice to opposing counsel (or self-represented party) before 8:00 am on the day of the hearing.

The Court considers the moving papers, opposition, and reply.

BACKGROUND

On September 28, 2022, Plaintiff University of Southern CA on behalf of its Verdugo Hills Hospital filed a complaint against Defendant 1 Source Business Solutions, LLC, asserting causes of action for (1) breach of implied-in-fact contract; (2) UCL violations; (3) quantum meruit; (4) accounts stated; and (5) unjust enrichment. Plaintiff alleges Defendant authorized Plaintiff to perform medically necessary services on Patient 1, a member beneficiary of Defendant. Plaintiff alleges Defendant now refuses to pay the reasonable value of the services provided.

ANALYSIS

A demurrer to a complaint may be taken to the whole complaint or to any of the causes of action in it. (CCP 430.50(a).) A demurrer challenges only the legal sufficiency of the complaint, not the truth of its factual allegations or the plaintiff's ability to prove those allegations. (Picton v. Anderson Union High Sch. Dist. (1996) 50 Cal. App. 4th 726, 732.) The court must treat as true the complaint's material factual allegations, but not contentions, deductions or conclusions of fact or law. (Id. at 732-33.) The complaint is to be construed liberally to determine whether a cause of action has been stated. (Id. at 733.)

Defendant demurs to the complaint on the ground that Defendant did not agree to pay for the services rendered by Plaintiff on behalf of its member Patient 1. “The standard elements of a claim for breach of contract are: ‘(1) the contract, (2) plaintiff’s performance or excuse for nonperformance, (3) defendant’s breach, and (4) damage to plaintiff therefrom.’” (Wall Street Network, Ltd. v. New York Times Co. (2008) 164 Cal.App.4th 1171, 1178.) “A cause of action for breach of implied contract has the same elements as does a cause of action for breach of contract, except that the promise is not expressed in words but is implied from the promisor’s conduct.” (Yari v. Producers Guild of America, Inc. (2008) 161 Cal.App.4th 172, 182.)

Plaintiff alleges Defendant provided authorization for medical services on March 1, 2021, impliedly agreeing to pay for the services. (Compl. 20.) Plaintiff alleges it relied on this authorization and provided the services. This is sufficient to allege an implied-in-fact contract.

Defendant asserts it is not obligated to pay for the services because the authorization explicitly stated that it was not a guarantee of payment. First, this authorization is not attached to the complaint and Defendant has not requested judicial notice of it; it is simply attached to the demurrer. The Court cannot consider extrinsic evidence on demurrer. Second, the Court is not persuaded that this language unequivocally absolves Defendant of any obligation to pay for services. Whether an obligation to pay exists cannot be resolved on demurrer.

Defendant also argues that Plaintiff does not have standing to bring its claims and instead must seek payment from the Patient. As stated, Plaintiff alleges Defendant authorized Plaintiff to perform services on the Patient. This is sufficient to confer standing on Plaintiff.

As Plaintiff has alleged Defendant had an obligation to pay for services rendered, Plaintiff’s claims for UCL violations and common counts are sufficiently pled.

Defendant’s demurrer is OVERRULED.