This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/10/2023 at 13:34:34 (UTC).

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON BEHALF OF ITS KECK HOSPITAL OF USC AND ON BEHALF OF ITS USC KENNETH NORRIS JR. CANCER HO VS THE HAWTHORN GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON BEHALF OF ITS KECK HOSPITAL OF USC AND ON BEHALF OF ITS USC KENNETH NORRIS JR CANCER HO filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against THE HAWTHORN GROUP, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1292

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA ON BEHALF OF ITS KECK HOSPITAL OF USC AND ON BEHALF OF ITS USC KENNETH NORRIS JR. CANCER HOSPITAL

Defendant

THE HAWTHORN GROUP INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHARIFI PANTEA R.

SPERLING STEVEN D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

1/20/2023: Complaint

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/20/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/20/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/20/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/20/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/23/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

1/26/2023: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2023
  • Hearing05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: University of Southern California on behalf of its Keck Hospital of USC and on behalf of its USC Kenneth Norris JR. Cancer Hospital (Plaintiff); As to: The Hawthorn Group, Inc. (Defendant); Service Date: 01/25/2023; Service Cost: 70.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- University of Southern California on behalf of its Keck Hospital of USC and on behalf of its USC Kenneth Norris JR. Cancer Hospital (Plaintiff): Organization Name changed from UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA on behalf of its KECK HOSPITAL OF USC and on behalf of its USC KENNETH NORRIS JR. CANCER HOSPITAL to University of Southern California on behalf of its Keck Hospital of USC and on behalf of its USC Kenneth Norris JR. Cancer Hospital

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- The Hawthorn Group, Inc. (Defendant): Organization Name changed from THE HAWTHORN GROUP, INC. to The Hawthorn Group, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Pantea R. Sharifi (Attorney): First Name changed from PANTEA to Pantea; Last Name changed from SHARIFI to Sharifi; Organization Name changed from HELTON LAW GROUP to Helton Law Group

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAddress for Pantea R. Sharifi (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Steven D. Sperling (Attorney): First Name changed from STEVEN to Steven; Last Name changed from SPERLING to Sperling; Organization Name changed from HELTON LAW GROUP to Helton Law Group

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketAddress for Steven D. Sperling (Attorney) updated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 28

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA on behalf of its KECK HOSPITAL OF USC and on behalf of its USC KENNETH NORRIS JR. CANCER HOSPITAL (Plaintiff); As to: THE HAWTHORN GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA on behalf of its KECK HOSPITAL OF USC and on behalf of its USC KENNETH NORRIS JR. CANCER HOSPITAL (Plaintiff); As to: THE HAWTHORN GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA on behalf of its KECK HOSPITAL OF USC and on behalf of its USC KENNETH NORRIS JR. CANCER HOSPITAL (Plaintiff); As to: THE HAWTHORN GROUP, INC. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Rupert A. Byrdsong in Department 28 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less