Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 00:14:27 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL STEEL SERVICES, INC., VS METAL SUPPLY, LLC,

Case Summary

On 11/01/2018 UNIVERSAL STEEL SERVICES, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against METAL SUPPLY, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3607

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL STEEL SERVICES INC.

Defendant

METAL SUPPLY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RYAN GREGORY ROBERT

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

8/6/2019: Minute Order

Notice

5/13/2019: Notice

Minute Order

5/8/2019: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/18/2019: Minute Order

Case Management Statement

2/27/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice

1/2/2019: Notice

Proof of Service by Mail

1/2/2019: Proof of Service by Mail

Complaint

11/1/2018: Complaint

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/28/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/1/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons

11/1/2018: Summons

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/1/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 40 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • DocketNotice ( OF CONTINUED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT)); Filed by Universal Steel Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (FOR ENTRY OF JUDGEMENT PURSUANT TO CODE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6); Filed by Universal Steel Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Universal Steel Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Universal Steel Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketNotice (Of Errata To Plaintiff Universal Steel Services, Inc's Complaint For Damages); Filed by Universal Steel Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Universal Steel Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Universal Steel Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Universal Steel Services, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where METAL SUPPLY INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RYAN GREGORY R.