This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/06/2022 at 20:06:42 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA VS YING PING LI

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YING PING LI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON and COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0143

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

TERESA SANCHEZ-GORDON

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA

Defendant

LI YING PING

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TRUONG TIFFANY DANG

GORDON ELI A.

Defendant Attorneys

WONG HELEN

LIU LONG Z

 

Court Documents

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

8/2/2022: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VICTORIA CHIANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

8/2/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VICTORIA CHIANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

Proof of Service by Mail

7/14/2022: Proof of Service by Mail

Motion to Dismiss

7/14/2022: Motion to Dismiss

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF YING PING LI

7/14/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF YING PING LI

Substitution of Attorney

6/15/2022: Substitution of Attorney

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/23/2022: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/10/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

5/5/2022: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

5/9/2022: Case Management Statement

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/10/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/10/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/10/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

12/10/2021: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/13/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/13/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Answer

2/16/2022: Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/23/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2023
  • Hearing03/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2023
  • Hearing03/02/2023 at 09:00 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • Hearing09/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2022
  • Hearing08/16/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Hearing on Motion to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketOpposition (Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss); Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Victoria Chiang in Support of Plaintiffs Opposition to Defendants Motion to Dismiss); Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (Declaration of Ying Ping Li); Filed by Ying Ping Li (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Ying Ping Li (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Filed by Ying Ping Li (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Ying Ping Li (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketAffidavit (of Due Diligence); Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Ying Ping Li (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON ELI A.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRUONG TIFFANY DANG