This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/09/2022 at 07:13:55 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS YANG JI, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YANG JI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JOEL L. LOFTON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0140

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOEL L. LOFTON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

AN YING

HE WEN

JI YANG

YAN YI GUO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUONG TIFFANY DANG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

12/9/2021: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/9/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/9/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

12/29/2021: Notice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

12/9/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

12/9/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/1/2022: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF HEARING: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

2/24/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

2/16/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

Proof of Personal Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

2/16/2022: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Declaration re: Due Diligence - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

2/16/2022: Declaration re: Due Diligence - AFFIDAVIT OF DUE DILIGENCE

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2022
  • Hearing05/04/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department X at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketNotice (NOTICE OF HEARING: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE); Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department X, Joel L. Lofton, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Due Diligence; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketAffidavit of Due Diligence; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Universal Shopping Plaza, a California limited partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant