This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/22/2022 at 15:25:27 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS PAK HUEY INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against PAK HUEY INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is COLIN P. LEIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0191

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

COLIN P. LEIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

PAK HUEY INC.

PIAO HAI FENG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRUONG TIFFANY DANG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

4/4/2022: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

4/4/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/4/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/4/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/4/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

5/27/2022: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/27/2022: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

6/3/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Notice of Ruling

6/3/2022: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

8/31/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • Hearing12/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 3 at 150 West Commonwealth, Alhambra, CA 91801; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Colin P. Leis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Colin P. Leis, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant