This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/28/2022 at 03:44:23 (UTC).

UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP VS BAKE CODE 1001 INC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/05/2021 UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BAKE CODE 1001 INC,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0468

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

Defendants

YANG KAIHONG

BAKE CODE 1001 INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GORDON ELI A.

 

Court Documents

Judgment - JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - BEFORE TRIAL - 09/22/2021 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AGAINST DEFENDANT BAKE CODE 1001 INC; DEFEN

9/22/2021: Judgment - JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT - BEFORE TRIAL - 09/22/2021 ENTERED FOR PLAINTIFF UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP AGAINST DEFENDANT BAKE CODE 1001 INC; DEFEN

Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

10/15/2021: Abstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

9/22/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: ENTRY OF ...)

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LOST OR OTHERWISE UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL LEASE, ASSIGNMENT OF LEASE, GUARANTY, AND LEDGER [PROPOSED] ORDER

7/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF LOST OR OTHERWISE UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL LEASE, ASSIGNMENT OF LEASE, GUARANTY, AND LEDGER [PROPOSED] ORDER

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT AND COURT JUDGMENT

7/8/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT / JUDGMENT AND COURT JUDGMENT

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

9/16/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TIFFANY D. TRUONG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(B), (C) AGAINST DEFENDANTS

7/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF TIFFANY D. TRUONG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(B), (C) AGAINST DEFENDANTS

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VICTORIA CHIANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP 585.1(D)

7/8/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF VICTORIA CHIANG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP 585.1(D)

Proof of Service by Mail

7/8/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Request for Dismissal

7/8/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

6/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

6/1/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/1/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

4/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

4/5/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketAbstract of Judgment - Civil and Small Claims; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Order to Show Cause Re: (Entry of Default Judgment/Default Prove-up Pursuant to Code of Civil Procedure 585) - Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department D; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Entry of ...)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketJudgment (- Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 09/22/2021 entered for Plaintiff UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership against Defendant BAKE CODE 1001 INC; Defendant Kaihong Yang.); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment (and Court Judgment); Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF TIFFANY D. TRUONG IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT PURSUANT TO CCP 585(b), (c) AGAINST DEFENDANTS); Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketDeclaration (DECLARATION OF LOST OR OTHERWISE UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL LEASE, ASSIGNMENT OF LEASE, GUARANTY, AND LEDGER [PROPOSED] ORDER); Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA, a California Limited Partnership (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIVERSAL SHOPPING PLAZA A CALIFORNIA LIMITED PARTNERSHIP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GORDON ELI A.