This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/11/2022 at 09:55:22 (UTC).

UNITEDLAYER, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY VS WARNER BROS. INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2020 UNITEDLAYER, LLC, A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WARNER BROS INC , A DELAWARE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8852

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITEDLAYER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Defendants

FANDANGO MEDIA LLC A VIRGINIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

WARNER BROS. INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION

NBCUNIVERSAL MEDIA LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WAGNER BRIAN JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

8/3/2021: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

7/27/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL (SETTLEMENT))

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/17/2021: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

6/18/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Case Management Statement

3/29/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

4/16/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/8/2021: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

2/9/2021: Case Management Statement

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

2/23/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE T...)

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

8/25/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

7/30/2020: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/3/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/3/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by UnitedLayer, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal (Settlement) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 39; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by UnitedLayer, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by UnitedLayer, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure t...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by UnitedLayer, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by UnitedLayer, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by UnitedLayer, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by UnitedLayer, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WARNER BROS. LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where UNITEDLAYER LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Fandango Media, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where NBCUniversal Media, LLC is a litigant