This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/22/2021 at 15:38:39 (UTC).

UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY, A MARYLAND CORPORATION VS RENEE GAMERO

Case Summary

On 06/18/2021 UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY, A MARYLAND CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RENEE GAMERO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2793

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED STATES SURETY COMPANY

Defendant

GAMERO RENEE AKA RENEE SAMANTHA GAMERO AKA SAMANTHA GAMERO AKA SAMANTHA G. LEON-PORTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIM AMBER N.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

6/21/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

6/21/2021: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/18/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

6/18/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

6/18/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/18/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • Hearing10/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • Hearing08/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 56 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by United States Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by United States Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by United States Surety Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KIM AMBER