This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/07/2020 at 03:27:10 (UTC).

UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY, AN IOWA CORPORATION VS JMI SANITATION SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 UNITED FIRE CASUALTY COMPANY, AN IOWA CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JMI SANITATION SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are LAURA A. SEIGLE and MARGARET MILLER BERNAL. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2678

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

LAURA A. SEIGLE

MARGARET MILLER BERNAL

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY AN IOWA CORPORATION

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

INDUSTRIAL FIRE PROTECTION

CALIFORNIA PLANT SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TURNER PAUL H.

TRI INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION

JMI SANITATION SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

FENNER ROBERT DBA FIREMASTER/ MASTER PROTECTION LP

MASTER PROTECTION CORPORATION DBA FIREMASTER

FENNER ROBERT

TRI ASSOCIATES WEST INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRI INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA GUARDIAN INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

BARRY-WEHMILLER DESIGN GROUP INC.

DELPHEY- GERDES ENGINERRING INC.

DELPHEY-GERDES ENGINEERING INC.

MOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE

Plaintiffs, Cross Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY AN IOWA CORPORATION

CALIFORNIA PLANT SERVICE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TURNER PAUL H.

TRI INC. A COLORADO CORPORATION

JMI SANITATION SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRI ASSOCIATES WEST INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TRI INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

ZOES 1 THROUGH 25 INCLUSIVE.

MOES 1 THRU 50

ZOES 1 THROUGH 25

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

KNAPP AARON TRISTAN

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

THAI TAMMY LOUIE

SPOONER GABRIEL

SCANLON TIMOTHY

KAHN JAMES N

TIWANA SIMRAN S.

NUSBAUM RICHARD E

TIWANA SIMRANDEEP SINGH

NUSBAUM RICHARD A.

NUSBAUM RICHARD EDGAR

KNAPP AARON TRISTAN

FAENZA CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

TIWANA SIMRAN S.

TIWANA SIMRANDEEP SINGH

FAENZA CHRISTOPHER EDWARD

ARENS RUSSELL R

HAND BENJAMIN KAPLAN

DEMETRUIS CHRISTINE CAROL

 

Court Documents

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SIMRAN S. TIWANA IN SUPPORT OF AND FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DEFENDANTS BARRY WEHMILLER DESIGN GROUP, INC. AND DESIGN GROUP FACILITIES SOLUTIONS, INC.S EXPARTE

10/29/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF SIMRAN S. TIWANA IN SUPPORT OF AND FILED CONCURRENTLY WITH DEFENDANTS BARRY WEHMILLER DESIGN GROUP, INC. AND DESIGN GROUP FACILITIES SOLUTIONS, INC.S EXPARTE

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS BARRY WEHMILLER DESIGN GROUP, INC. AND DESIGN GROUP FACILITIES SOLUTIONS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JMI SANITATION, INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FILED CONCURREN

11/2/2020: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANTS BARRY WEHMILLER DESIGN GROUP, INC. AND DESIGN GROUP FACILITIES SOLUTIONS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JMI SANITATION, INC.S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE FILED CONCURREN

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

11/5/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE)

Case Management Statement

9/23/2019: Case Management Statement

Substitution of Attorney

9/24/2019: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

9/20/2019: Case Management Statement

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

9/20/2019: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/11/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Case Management Statement

9/16/2019: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

9/17/2019: Case Management Statement

Cross-Complaint

8/5/2019: Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

7/25/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE)

Case Management Statement

7/10/2019: Case Management Statement

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

6/10/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

6/10/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT C...)

6/10/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT C...)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

6/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER REGARDING SETTING CASE FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFER...)

74 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Order to Show Cause Re: (regarding answer/responsive pleading by cross defendant California Plant Services to the cross complaint of California Guardian filed 7/11/2019) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • Docketat 09:30 AM in Department F; Trial Setting Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketTrial Setting Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Motion to Consolidate)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: regarding answer/responsive pleading ...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketNotice (OF HEARING ON DEFENDANTS BARRY WEHMILLER DESIGN GROUP, INC. AND DESIGN GROUP FACILITIES SOLUTIONS, INC.?S EXPARTE APPLICATION REGARDING HEARING ON DEFENDANT JMI SANITATION, INC.?S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE); Filed by Barry-Wehmiller Design Group, Inc. (Defendant); Delphey- Gerdes Enginerring, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department C; Hearing on Ex Parte Application (Exparte Application Regarding Hearing on Defendant JMI Sanitation, Inc's Motion To Consolidate) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Exparte Application Regarding...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketOpposition (DEFENDANTS BARRY WEHMILLER DESIGN GROUP, INC. AND DESIGN GROUP FACILITIES SOLUTIONS, INC.?S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT JMI SANITATION, INC.?S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE filed concurrently with REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE); Filed by Barry-Wehmiller Design Group, Inc. (Defendant); Delphey- Gerdes Enginerring, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
101 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT C...) of 06/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by United Fire & Casualty Company, an Iowa Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Minute Order (Court Order re Notice of Related Case) of 06/10/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (ORDER TRANSFERRING PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO INDEPENDENT C...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ([PI General Order] and Standing Order re PI Procedures and Hearing Dates); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • DocketPI General Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by United Fire & Casualty Company, an Iowa Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by United Fire & Casualty Company, an Iowa Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • DocketComplaint (-Pursuant to Court's Order of 8/01/2019, the Complaint is deemed filed 04/02/2019 Nunc Pro Tunc); Filed by United Fire & Casualty Company, an Iowa Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INDUSTRIAL FIRE PROTECTION is a litigant

Latest cases where MASTER PROTECTION LP is a litigant