Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/12/2021 at 17:31:09 (UTC).

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY VS FERESHTEH M. FARNOUD

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against FERESHTEH M FARNOUD. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3475

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNITED FINANCIAL CASUALTY COMPANY

Defendant

FARNOUD FERESHTEH M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

NIVINSKUS MARK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2024
  • Hearing04/04/2024 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • Hearing09/22/2022 at 10:00 AM in Department 32 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketStatement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death); Filed by United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by United Financial Casualty Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Financial Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NIVINSKUS MARK ROBERT