This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/11/2019 at 11:50:04 (UTC).

UNION PATRIOT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT II LLC ET AL VS RICHARD RIO

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 UNION PATRIOT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT II LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against RICHARD RIO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7697

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Respondents

I AM WRATH PRODUCTION INC

UNION PATRIOT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT LLC

UNION PATRIOT CAPITAL MANAGEMENT II LLC

Defendants and Appellants

HANNIBAL CLASSICS INC

DEL CASTRO RICHARD RIONDA

CASTRO RIONDA DEL

USS INDIANAPOLIS PRODUCTION INC

DEL CASTRO PATRICIA EBERLE RIONDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAIL MAUREEN

Respondent Attorney

COATE CHARLES M. ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

2/8/2018: Minute Order

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

2/9/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

2/13/2018: PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO THE COURT'S ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

2/26/2018: NOTICE RE: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/5/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

3/9/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTRO, PATRICA EBERLE RIONDA DEL CASTRO, HANNIBAL CLASSICS INC. AND USS INDIANAPOLIS PRODUCTION, INC.'S NOTICE OF AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

3/9/2018: DEFENDANTS RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTRO, PATRICA EBERLE RIONDA DEL CASTRO, HANNIBAL CLASSICS INC. AND USS INDIANAPOLIS PRODUCTION, INC.'S NOTICE OF AND DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT; ETC

NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF DEFENDANTS RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTRO, PATRICA EBERLE RIONDA DEL CASTRO, HANNIBAL CLASSICS INC AND USS INDIANAPOLIS PRODUCTION, INC.'S HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IN DEPA

3/19/2018: NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF DEFENDANTS RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTRO, PATRICA EBERLE RIONDA DEL CASTRO, HANNIBAL CLASSICS INC AND USS INDIANAPOLIS PRODUCTION, INC.'S HEARING ON DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT IN DEPA

PLAINTJFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTRO, PATRICIA EBERLE RIONDA DEL CASTRO, HANNIBAL CLASSICS INC. AND USS INDIANAPOLIS PRODUCTION, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

4/18/2018: PLAINTJFFS' OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTRO, PATRICIA EBERLE RIONDA DEL CASTRO, HANNIBAL CLASSICS INC. AND USS INDIANAPOLIS PRODUCTION, INC.'S DEMURRER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT

Minute Order

4/19/2018: Minute Order

DEFENDANTS RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTRO, PATRICA EBERLE RIONDA DEL CASTRO, HANNIBAL CLASSICS INC AND USS INDIANAPOLIS PRODUCTION, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

4/24/2018: DEFENDANTS RICHARD RIONDA DEL CASTRO, PATRICA EBERLE RIONDA DEL CASTRO, HANNIBAL CLASSICS INC AND USS INDIANAPOLIS PRODUCTION, INC.?S REPLY TO PLAINTIFFS? OPPOSITION TO DEMURRER TO COMPLAINT

Minute Order

5/1/2018: Minute Order

FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (1) FRAUD; ETC

5/18/2018: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (1) FRAUD; ETC

Minute Order

6/4/2018: Minute Order

NOTICE OF RULING AND CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

6/7/2018: NOTICE OF RULING AND CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IN LIEU OF ANSWER AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS, ETC

6/18/2018: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION BY DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IN LIEU OF ANSWER AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS, ETC

Unknown

6/18/2018: Unknown

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE: MOTION BY DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IN LIEU OF ANSWER AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

6/18/2018: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE RE: MOTION BY DEFENDANTS TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IN LIEU OF ANSWER AND MOTION TO STAY PROCEEDINGS

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Advanced and Vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • Docketat 2:18 PM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Court Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Court Order)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Union Patriot Capital Management II, LLC (Plaintiff); Union Patriot Capital Management, LLC (Plaintiff); I am Wrath Production, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by I am Wrath Production, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Union Patriot Capital Management, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Union Patriot Capital Management II, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • DocketAppeal Record Delivered; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
87 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketOSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Union Patriot Capital Management II, LLC (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (1) FRAUD; ETC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Union Patriot Capital Management II, LLC (Plaintiff); Union Patriot Capital Management, LLC (Plaintiff); I am Wrath Production, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7697 Hearing Date: June 16, 2022 Dept: 30

Dept. 30

Union Patriot Capital Management II, LLC, et. al. vs. Del Castro, et. al., Case No. BC681300

Union Patriot Capital Management II, LLC, et. al. vs. Del Castro, et. al., Case No. ****7697

Tentative Ruling re: Defendants’ Motion for New Trial

The above referenced related cases were filed in 2017. Defendants are Richard Rionda del Castro, Patricia Eberle Rionda del Castro, Hannibal Classics Inc., Marco Polo Production SAS, and USS Indianapolis Production, Inc. As of the time of trial, in August 2021, all of the defendants were unrepresented. The Court determined to conduct a court trial as to the liability of the corporate defendants first. Defendant Hannibal Classics, Inc. filed for bankruptcy on or about August 16, 2021. The Court then severed the case against Hannibal Classics, Inc. and proceeded to trial as to the remaining corporate defendants. Thereafter, the Court held a further court trial to determine whether the individual defendants were the alter egos of the corporate defendants. On November 30, 2021, after briefing and closing arguments, the Court found the corporate defendants liable to plaintiffs and further found that the individual defendants were the alter egos of the corporate defendants. At the request of defendants del Castro and Eberle, the Court issued statements of decision on March 9, 2022 and entered judgment on April 13, 2022.

On April 28, 2022, Defendants timely filed their notice of intent to move for new trial in both actions. Pursuant to CCP Section 659a, “[w]ithin 10 days of filing the notice, the moving party shall serve upon all other parties and file any brief and accompanying documents, including affidavits in support of the motion.” Ten days from April 28 was May 9. Defendants did not file their memorandum in BC681300 until May 13, 2022. Accordingly, Defendants’ new trial motion in BC681300 is denied as untimely. Even if the memorandum was timely filed and unopposed by Plaintiffs, the Court would still deny the motion for the reasons set forth below.

Defendants did timely file their memorandum in ****7697. For reasons unknown to the Court, Defendants filed two more memoranda in support of their new trial motion on May 10, 2022. These are not timely and will not be considered by the Court. Plaintiffs timely opposed the motion and Defendants filed a reply.

The Court has read these pleadings and finds Defendants’ arguments without merit. Defendants’ recitation of the procedural history of the case bares almost no resemblance to the facts as set forth in the Court files and in particular the Court’s statement of decision. Defendants were given the opportunity to defend themselves but instead engaged in gamesmanship designed to delay the proceedings as long as possible and to increase the expense to Plaintiffs. The new trial motion is therefore denied.



Case Number: ****7697    Hearing Date: June 30, 2020    Dept: 30

Dept. 30

Calendar No.

Union Patriot Capital Management II, LLC, et. al. vs. Del Castro, et. al., Case No. ****7697

Tentative Ruling re: Defendants’ Motion to be relieved as Counsel

Defendants’ Counsel moves to be relieved as counsel for defendants Richard and Patricia Rionda Del Castro, Hannibal Classics, Inc. and USS Indianapolis Production, Inc. It appears to the Court that the notice of motion, supporting declaration and proposed order has been timely and properly served on Defendants as well as opposing counsel. The unopposed motions are granted.



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Union Patriot Capital Management II LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where I am Wrath Production, Inc. is a litigant