This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 08:52:35 (UTC).

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY VS JUAN JOSE ORTIZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 04/09/2018 UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against JUAN JOSE ORTIZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1467

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMPANY

Defendants and Respondents

ORTIZ JUAN JOSE

FAST DEER BUS CHARTER

CHARTER FAST DEER BUS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Plaintiff Attorneys

UNION PACIFIC RAILROAD COMAPNY

GIBBONS ESQ. ROBERT JOHN

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

TRACHTMAN BENJAMIN R. ESQ.

TRACHTMAN BENJAMIN ROSS ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

1/30/2019: Request for Dismissal

Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

12/6/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Case Management Conference)

Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-19 00:00:00

9/19/2018: Minute Order - Minute order entered: 2018-09-19 00:00:00

Minute Order -

9/19/2018: Minute Order -

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

9/19/2018: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: Order

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling re Case Management Conference

12/12/2018: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling re Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

11/19/2018: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Case Management Statement

11/20/2018: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

11/26/2018: Case Management Statement

Notice - Notice of tentative order re: application for an order permitting Kyle Wallor appear as counsel Pro Hav Vice

11/16/2018: Notice - Notice of tentative order re: application for an order permitting Kyle Wallor appear as counsel Pro Hav Vice

Other - - Other - Court's Order re: Application for Order Permitting Kyle Wallor to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

11/16/2018: Other - - Other - Court's Order re: Application for Order Permitting Kyle Wallor to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)

11/16/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/22/2018: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Service by Mail

10/24/2018: Proof of Service by Mail

Application - Application for admission pro hac vice of Kyle Wallor

10/24/2018: Application - Application for admission pro hac vice of Kyle Wallor

Declaration - Declaration of Robert J.Gibbons in support of application for admission pro hac vice of Kyle Wallor

10/24/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Robert J.Gibbons in support of application for admission pro hac vice of Kyle Wallor

Declaration - Declaration of Kyle Wallor in support of application for admission pro hac vice

10/24/2018: Declaration - Declaration of Kyle Wallor in support of application for admission pro hac vice

Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of application for admission pro hac vice of Kyle Wallor

10/24/2018: Memorandum of Points & Authorities - Memorandum of Points & Authorities in support of application for admission pro hac vice of Kyle Wallor

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review (re payment of fees for Pro Hac Vice Attorney Kyle-granted 11/16/2018) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 2, Georgina T. Rizk, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Ruling (re Case Management Conference); Filed by Fast Deer Bus Charter (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department B; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • DocketMinute Order ((Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Juan Jose Ortiz (Defendant); Fast Deer Bus Charter (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
27 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Fast Deer Bus Charter (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketAnswer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by Fast Deer Bus Charter (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Union Pacific Railroad Company (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Union Pacific Railroad Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRACHTMAN BENJAMIN R. ESQ.