This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/21/2022 at 04:38:49 (UTC).

UNIFIED REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS,LLC VS BEVERLY HILLS DIALYSIS PARTNERSHIP

Case Summary

On 12/31/2020 UNIFIED REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS,LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BEVERLY HILLS DIALYSIS PARTNERSHIP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are MALCOLM MACKEY and KEVIN C. BRAZILE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9924

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

MALCOLM MACKEY

KEVIN C. BRAZILE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNIFIED REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendant

BEVERLY HILLS DIALYSIS PARTNERSHIP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TRAGISH BENJAMIN SWENSON

REEDER CHRISTOPHER S

BLOCH ELAN

TRAGISH BENJAMIN S.

Defendant Attorney

LEWIS JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

Separate Statement

5/10/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/10/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

5/10/2022: Declaration - DECLARATION OF JEFFREY LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF MOTIONS TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES

Separate Statement

5/10/2022: Separate Statement

Separate Statement

5/10/2022: Separate Statement

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/10/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

5/10/2022: Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

4/21/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)

4/5/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (STATUS CONFERENCE RE: SETTLEMENT)

Notice of Ruling

4/7/2022: Notice of Ruling

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

3/17/2022: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER - CONFIDENTIAL AND HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

2/17/2022: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (INFORMAL DISCOVERY CONFERENCE (IDC))

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

12/31/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

12/31/2020: Complaint

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

12/31/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/31/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

12/31/2020: Notice - NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/14/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • Hearing10/10/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • Hearing10/06/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • Hearing08/26/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • Hearing08/12/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • Hearing08/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 20 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Beverly Hills Dialysis Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Beverly Hills Dialysis Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketSeparate Statement; Filed by Beverly Hills Dialysis Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketMotion to Compel Further Discovery Responses; Filed by Beverly Hills Dialysis Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketDeclaration (of Jeffrey Lewis in support of Motions to compel further responses); Filed by Beverly Hills Dialysis Partnership (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docketat 2:26 PM in Department 20, Kevin C. Brazile, Presiding; Court Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketClerks Certificate of Service By Electronic Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order Regarding Notice of Related Cases)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Related Cases); Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments,LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFIED REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BEVERLY HILLS PHYSICIANS A BUSINESS ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elan Bloch

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRAGISH BENJAMIN SWENSON