This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/21/2019 at 13:29:52 (UTC).

UNIFIED REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS LLC VS NEW PORT @ BEVERLY

Case Summary

On 01/23/2018 UNIFIED REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NEW PORT BEVERLY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON and DANIEL S. MURPHY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1362

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

SUSAN BRYANT-DEASON

DANIEL S. MURPHY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Petitioner and Appellant

UNIFIED REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS LLC

Respondents and Defendants

THONG PHILIP T.

DOES 1 TO 20

THONG ANDREA L.

HUA LY

LAM WENDY

NEW PORT @ BEVERLY HILLS INC

NEWPORT SEAFOOD RESTAURANT INC.

HUA HENRY HENG

NEWPORT SEAFOOD GROUP INC.

HUA CULINARY GROUP INC.

Interested Parties, Not Classified By Court and Respondents

NEWPORT SEAFOOD GROUP INC.

HUA CULINARY GROUP INC.

WONG FRED A. ESQ.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

REEDER CHRISTOPHER S. ESQ.

REEDER CHRISTOPHER SCOTT ESQ.

REEDER CHRISTOPHER SCOTT

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

WONG FRED A. ESQ.

WONG FRED AH-LING

WONG FRED AH-LING ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B301162, NOA 9/25/19;

12/10/2019: Appeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript - APPEAL - NOTICE COURT REPORTER TO PREPARE APPEAL TRANSCRIPT ;B301162, NOA 9/25/19;

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL EXHIBITS)

12/11/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL EXHIBITS)

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/11/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED "U"

12/11/2019: Appeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed - APPEAL - NOTICE OF APPEAL/CROSS APPEAL FILED "U"

Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL) NOA:12/11/19; "U"

12/12/2019: Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL) NOA:12/11/19; "U"

Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES REGARDING RECONSTRUCTED TRIAL EXHIBITS

12/13/2019: Stipulation - No Order - STIPULATION - NO ORDER JOINT STIPULATION BY THE PARTIES REGARDING RECONSTRUCTED TRIAL EXHIBITS

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

12/18/2019: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

12/19/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL EXHIBITS)

11/18/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STIPULATION REGARDING TRIAL EXHIBITS)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

11/13/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES)

Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

10/30/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ELAN BLOCH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

10/30/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION DECLARATION OF ELAN BLOCH IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF FRED A. WONG

11/4/2019: Reply - REPLY DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS & AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF FRED A. WONG

Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

10/24/2019: Notice - NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

10/16/2019: Appeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

10/22/2019: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

10/22/2019: Appeal - Notice of Default Issued

Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL) NOA:9/25/19

9/30/2019: Notice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) - NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF APPEAL (UNLIMITED CIVIL) NOA:9/25/19

182 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Ntc Designating Record of Appeal APP-003/010/103; Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments, LLC (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments, LLC (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketStipulation - No Order (Joint Stipulation by the Parties Regarding Reconstructed Trial Exhibits); Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments, LLC (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • DocketNotice of Filing of Notice of Appeal (Unlimited Civil) (NOA:12/11/19; "U"); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Stipulation regarding trial exhibits) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice of Appeal/Cross Appeal Filed ("U"); Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments, LLC (Appellant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketProof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Stipulation regarding trial exhibits)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketAppeal - Notice Court Reporter to Prepare Appeal Transcript (;B301162, NOA 9/25/19;); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 52, Susan Bryant-Deason, Presiding; Order to Show Cause Re: (Stipulation regarding trial exhibits) - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
255 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2018
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE AND ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Status Conference filed; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Unified Real Estate Investments, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR: 1. BREACH OF CONTRACT 2. CONVERSION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNIFIED REAL ESTATE INVESTMENTS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WONG FRED A