Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/03/2021 at 12:38:01 (UTC).

UNICOM INTERNATIONAL, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS KINDNESS GENERAL CONTRACTORS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/23/2020 UNICOM INTERNATIONAL, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against KINDNESS GENERAL CONTRACTORS, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0837

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Santa Monica Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNICOM INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants, Cross Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

ETCO HOMES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

KINDNESS GENERAL CONTRACTORS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

MOES 1 TROUGH 500

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KULIK GLEN LANCE

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

JOHNSON KAREN MAYANN

LAWRENCE LISA

Cross Defendant Attorney

OLSEN CHRISTOPHER TED

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

4/15/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL)

Request for Dismissal

4/19/2021: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Settlement

2/16/2021: Notice of Settlement

Case Management Statement

2/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/2/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

2/4/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Unicom International, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Kindness General Contractors, LLC, a California Limited Liability Company (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by ETCO Homes, Inc., a California corporation (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketStatus Report; Filed by Unicom International, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 09:00 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department M; Hearing on Motion to Strike (not anti-SLAPP) - without Demurrer - Not Held - Rescheduled by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Continuance of Case Management Conference); Filed by Unicom International, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • DocketNotice Re: Continuance of Hearing and Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Unicom International, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Unicom International, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2020
  • DocketNotice (Amended Civil Case Cover Sheet); Filed by Unicom International, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Unicom International, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Unicom International, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Unicom International, Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNICOM INTERNATIONAL INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where KINDNESS GENERAL CONTRACTORS LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where ETCO HOMES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where THYSSENKRUPP ELEVATOR CORPORATION, is a litigant