Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/16/2020 at 20:59:06 (UTC).

UNICARGO EXPRESS INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS DUNG Q. TRAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 UNICARGO EXPRESS INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against DUNG Q TRAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Torrance Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0374

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Torrance Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UNICARGO EXPRESS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

TRAN DUNG Q.

VIETLINK GLOBAL CORP. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERTS CAMERON WILLIAM

 

Court Documents

Judgment

2/14/2020: Judgment

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ENTRY OF CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT)

2/14/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: ENTRY OF CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT)

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RULING ON NRC AND ENTRY OF JUD...)

1/31/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: RULING ON NRC AND ENTRY OF JUD...)

Notice of Related Case

1/8/2020: Notice of Related Case

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN LIU IN SUPPORT OF CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

1/15/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SEAN LIU IN SUPPORT OF CONFESSION OF JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/15/2020

1/15/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/15/2020

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/15/2020

1/15/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER RE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE) OF 01/15/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REJECTION OF CONFESSION OF JUD...)

12/30/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REJECTION OF CONFESSION OF JUD...)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REJECTION OF CONFESSION OF JUD...) OF 12/30/2019

12/30/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (NON-APPEARANCE CASE REVIEW RE: REJECTION OF CONFESSION OF JUD...) OF 12/30/2019

Confession of Judgment

12/9/2019: Confession of Judgment

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/9/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review (reentry of confession of judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketJudgment; Filed by Unicargo Express Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: entry of confession of judgment)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review (reruling on NRC and entry of judgment) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: ruling on NRC and entry of jud...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docketat 3:09 PM in Department ; Court Order - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of 01/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Sean Liu in Support of Confession of Judgment); Filed by Unicargo Express Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ((Court Order Re Notice of Related Case) of 01/15/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by Unicargo Express Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • Docketat 08:27 AM in Department B; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Non-Appearance Case Review re: Rejection of confession of jud...) of 12/30/2019); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review re: Rejection of confession of jud...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketConfession of Judgment; Filed by Unicargo Express Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Unicargo Express Inc., a California corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Vietlink Global Corp is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERTS CAMERON WILLIAM