This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/13/2020 at 16:04:20 (UTC).

UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC VS ROK MOBILE INC

Case Summary

On 02/20/2018 UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ROK MOBILE INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4781

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC

UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC.

Defendants and Respondents

DOES 1 TO 20

ROK MOBILE INC

ROK MOBILE INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

ROK MOBILE INC.

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant

UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

BURROW LINDA M.

LEE LENNETTE W

FRID ALEXANDER

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

WILSON SONSINI GOODRICH & ROSATI

MERINO ALEXANDER M.

WRIGHT KERRY GARVIS

SHRAKE MARC

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorney

LEE LENNETTE W

 

Court Documents

Notice - Notice of Court Order Entering Stipulation

2/25/2019: Notice - Notice of Court Order Entering Stipulation

Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ROK MOBILE INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

4/29/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT ROK MOBILE INC.'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

Separate Statement

5/20/2019: Separate Statement

Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PLAINTIFF UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC.'S DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL

6/4/2019: Notice of Lodging - NOTICE OF LODGING PLAINTIFF UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC.'S DOCUMENTS IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT CONDITIONALLY UNDER SEAL

Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT ROK MOBILE, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

6/28/2019: Opposition - OPPOSITION DEFENDANT ROK MOBILE, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION FOR SUMMARY ADJUDICATION; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES

Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT ROK MOBILE, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

6/28/2019: Objection - OBJECTION DEFENDANT ROK MOBILE, INC.'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SUMMARY ADJUDICATION

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL D. LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ROK MOBILE, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

6/28/2019: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL D. LEWIS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT ROK MOBILE, INC.'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)

7/9/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A CROSS-COMPLAINT)

Response - RESPONSE UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC.'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

7/19/2019: Response - RESPONSE UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC.'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND [PROPOSED] ORDER

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

7/19/2019: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC. MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE - HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

8/6/2019: Stipulation and Order - STIPULATION AND ORDER PROTECTIVE - HIGHLY CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS

Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

8/26/2019: Order Appointing Court Approved Reporter as Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC.'S DEMURRER

8/30/2019: Reply - REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF AND CROSS-DEFENDANT UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC.'S DEMURRER

Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAMUEL C. CONTINA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

1/31/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF SAMUEL C. CONTINA IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER DISCOVERY RESPONSES

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/21/2020

5/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (COURT ORDER) OF 05/21/2020

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

7/9/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL)

Notice of Ruling

7/29/2020: Notice of Ruling

Substitution of Attorney

8/20/2020: Substitution of Attorney

124 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • Hearing05/24/2021 at 10:00 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • Hearing05/14/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 74 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 74; Order to Show Cause Re: (Striking ROK Mobile?s Answer for Failure to Retain Counsel) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Striking ROK Mobile?s Answer for Fail...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Rok Mobile Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docketat 2:00 PM in Department 74; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Informal Discovery Conference (IDC))); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • DocketInformal Discovery Conference; Filed by UMG Recordings Services Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docketat 4:00 PM in Department 74; Informal Discovery Conference (IDC) - Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Rok Mobile Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
195 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2018
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketMiscellaneous-Other; Filed by Rok Mobile Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Filed by UMG Recordings Services Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by UMG Recordings Services Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC694781    Hearing Date: July 09, 2020    Dept: 74

BC694781 UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC vs ROK MOBILE INC

Glaser Weil Fink Howard Avchen & Shapiro, LLP’s Motion to be Relieved as Counsel

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is GRANTED. The court sets an OSC re Striking ROK Mobile’s Answer for Failure to Retain Counsel on September 2, 2020 at 8:30 a.m. Moving party to give notice.

Case Number: BC694781    Hearing Date: February 26, 2020    Dept: 74

BC694781 UMG RECORDINGS SERVICES INC VS ROK MOBILE INC

Plaintiff’s Motion to Compel Further Responses and Production of Documents

TENTATIVE RULING: The motion is granted in part. ROK is ordered to produce documents, including a privilege for documents withheld on grounds of privilege, within fourteen days. ROK is also ordered to pay UMG Recording Services, Inc. sanctions of $2500 within 30 days.

Motion to Compel Further Responses to Request for Production

As the cross-complaint has been dismissed, ROK is no longer seeking lost profits as damages. The motion is denied as moot. The court cautions ROK that no evidence from the general ledger will be permitted at trial.

Motion to Compel Production of Documents

A motion to compel compliance as agreed with a request for production of documents is based upon a showing that the respondents failed to failed to permit an inspection ‘in accordance with that party's statement of compliance.’" (Standon Co. v. Sup. Ct. (1990) 225 Cal. App. 3d 898, 903; Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.320, subd. (a).)

ROK agreed to produce documents months before it decided to dismiss its cross-complaint. The motion is granted. ROK is ordered to produce documents, including a privilege log for documents withheld on grounds of privilege.

Sanctions

ROK is ordered to pay UMG sanctions of $2500.