This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/01/2019 at 06:41:01 (UTC).

UMARIN WACHTER VS YAMASHIRO HOLLYWOOD RESTAURANT

Case Summary

On 10/02/2017 UMARIN WACHTER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against YAMASHIRO HOLLYWOOD RESTAURANT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7990

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WACHTER UMARIN

Defendant

CEDAR RESTAURANT GROUP LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ARDALAN P. CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

10/2/2017: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

SUMMONS

10/2/2017: SUMMONS

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

11/13/2017: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

Notice

3/20/2019: Notice

Stipulation and Order

3/8/2019: Stipulation and Order

NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

5/9/2018: NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

3/7/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

1/5/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • DocketPlaintiff Umarin Wachter Notice of Change of Firm Address; Filed by Umarin Wachter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 3, Jon R. Takasugi, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Continued - Stipulation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • DocketStipulation and Order (Proposed Order and Stip to continue Trial and FSC); Filed by Umarin Wachter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketNotice and Acknowledgment of Receipt; Filed by Umarin Wachter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • DocketNOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint; Filed by Umarin Wachter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • DocketAMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by Plaintiff/Petitioner

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2017
  • DocketProof-Service/Summons; Filed by Umarin Wachter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Umarin Wachter (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: ****7990    Hearing Date: December 19, 2019    Dept: 3

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA

FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES – CENTRAL DISTRICT

UMARIN WACHTER,

Plaintiff,

v.

YAMASHIRO HOLLYWOOD RESTAURANT , et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.: ****7990

ORDER TRANSFERRING COMPLICATED PERSONAL INJURY (PI) CASE TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR (IC) COURT

After review of the court file, the Court makes the following order:

Department 3 of the Personal Injury Court has determined that the above entitled action is complicated based upon the number of pretrial hearings and/or the complexity of the issues presented.

AT THE DIRECTION OF DEPARTMENT 1:

This case is hereby transferred and reassigned to the following Independent Calendar Court in THE CENTRAL DISTRICT, JUDGE WILLIAM FAHEY presiding in DEPT. 69 of the STANLEY MOSK Courthouse, for all purposes except trial. Department 1 hereby delegates to the Independent Calendar Court the authority to assign the cause for trial to that Independent Calendar Court.

The Order is signed and filed this date, and incorporated herein by reference. Any pending motions or hearings, including trial and status conferences, will be reset, continued or vacated at the direction of the newly assigned Independent Calendar court.

Upon receipt of this notice, counsel for Plaintiff shall give notice to all parties of record.

DATED: December 19, 2019 ___________________________

Hon. Jon Takasugi

Judge of the Superior Court



related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CEDAR RESTAURANT GROUP LLC. A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ARDALAN PEZHMAN CHRISTOPHER