This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/23/2020 at 15:18:50 (UTC).

UMAMI BURGER LLC. VS. ALLEN RAVERT, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 08/28/2017 UMAMI BURGER LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ALLEN RAVERT, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Burbank Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are RALPH C. HOFER, LAURA A. MATZ and CURTIS A. KIN. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****7233

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

RALPH C. HOFER

LAURA A. MATZ

CURTIS A. KIN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

UMAMI BURGER LLC

Defendants

UMAMI BURGER VALLI LLC A CA. CORPORATION

RAVERT ALLEN AN INDIVIDUAL

RAVERT ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MARC R. JACOBS

JACOBS MARC R.

Defendant Attorney

FREEDMAN + TAITELMAN LLP

 

Court Documents

Summons

8/28/2017: Summons

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/28/2017: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/28/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

8/28/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: COMPLAINT FILED-SUMMONS ISSUED

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/28/2017: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

8/28/2017: Notice - NOTICE OF OSC

Notice of Related Case

9/14/2017: Notice of Related Case

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-09-20 00:00:00

9/20/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-09-20 00:00:00

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF LODGING

9/20/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: NOTICE OF LODGING

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EXPARTE APPLICATION

9/20/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: EXPARTE APPLICATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

9/20/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

9/20/2017: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

9/20/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

9/20/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: DECLARATION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

9/21/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: PROOF-SERVICE/SUMMONS

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

9/26/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: OPPOSITION

Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION

9/27/2017: Legacy Document - LEGACY DOCUMENT TYPE: STIPULATION

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-09-27 00:00:00

9/27/2017: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER ENTERED: 2017-09-27 00:00:00

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2019
  • Docketat 4:11 PM in Department E, Curtis A. Kin, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Non-Appearance Case Review)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department E; (Motion; Court makes Order) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Docketat 08:30 am in Department NCGE, Other District Judge, Presiding; Motion (OF PLAINTIFF, UMAMI BURGER, TOENFORCE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENTPURSUANT TO CALIFORNIA CODE OFCIVIL PROCEDURE SECTION 664.6) - Court makes Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketMinute order entered: 2018-06-29 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice; Filed by ALLEN, RAVERT (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • DocketNotice (OF ERRATA RE: DECLARATION OF ALLEN RAVERT IN SUPPORT OF THE COMBINED OPPOSITION ); Filed by Attorney for Defendant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketSupplemental Declaration (OF MARC R. JACOBS ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketObjection (TO DECLARATION OF ALLEN RAVERT ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DocketObjection (TO DECLARATION ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
95 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by UMAMI BURGER, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • DocketNotice-Related Cases (RELATED TO EC067234 ); Filed by Attorney for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketSummons; Filed by null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketNotice (of osc)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketSummons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketComplaint filed-Summons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

b'

Case Number: EC067233 Hearing Date: July 16, 2021 Dept: D

TENTATIVE RULING
Calendar: \t18 \t\t\t\t
Date: \t7/16/2021\t\t\t\t
Case No:\t\tEC067233\t\t\t\t\tTrial Date: December 6, 2021
Case Name:\tBenjauthrit v. Benjauthrit
MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION
\t[CCP §526]
Moving Party:\t\tPlaintiff Prapai Benjauthrit
Responding Party:\tDefendant Boonseing Benjauthrit (No Opposition)
FACTUAL AND PROCEDURAL BACKGROUND:
Plaintiff Prapai Benjauthrit brings this action against her brother, defendant Boonseing Benjauthrit, alleging that the parties took title to four properties on Marion Drive in Glendale in 1977 as joint tenants, with the subject property to be the principal place of residence of plaintiff. Plaintiff alleges that defendant wrongfully induced plaintiff to sign away her interest in the subject property while plaintiff was recovering from a coma.
Evidently, an unlawful detainer action was filed by Mr. Benjauthrit against Angelo Martinez, plaintiff’s husband. The trial was conducted on November 3, 2018, before the Honorable William Dodson, and the court ruled in favor of Mr. Benjauthrit and entered judgment. The court stayed enforcement of that judgment until November 30, 2018, to accommodate the filing of a motion to consolidate or stay the UD case.
This matter has been consolidated with the UD case, with this case designated the lead case, and the court has issued a preliminary injunction staying the unlawful detainer proceedings. Plaintiff has timely posted a $50,000 bond.
RELIEF REQUESTED:
Order enjoining defendant Boonsieng Benjauthrit and/ or his agents from entering the property which is where Plaintiff resides and which is also one of the subject properties of plaintiff’s quite title action which is 1507 Marion Dr, Glendale, CA 91205.
ANALYSIS:
Defendant Boonsieng Benjauthrit has filed a Notice of Non-Opposition to the motion for preliminary injunction, stating defendant “does not oppose the Motion for Preliminary Injunction,” and that the motion was unnecessary.
The motion accordingly is granted, and the injunction is issued at the concession of defendant.
RULING:
Motion for Preliminary Injunction is GRANTED, at the concession of defendant in the Notice of Non-Opposition. Good cause appearing, defendant Boonsieng Benjauthrit, and defendant’s agents or those acting on defendant’s behalf, are enjoined from entering the property at 1507 Marion Dr, Glendale, CA 91205 while this action is pending.
Plaintiff’s preliminary injunction bond in the sum of $50,000 is to remain on deposit with the Court.
GIVEN THE CORONAVIRUS CRISIS, AND TO ADHERE TO HEALTH GUIDANCE THAT DICTATES SAFETY MEASURES, DEPARTMENT D IS ENCOURAGING AUDIO OR VIDEO APPEARANCES
Please make arrangement in advance if you wish to appear via LACourtConnect/Microsoft Teams by visiting www.lacourt.org to schedule a remote appearance. Please note that LACourtConnect/Microsoft Teams offers audio and video appearance at a cost of $15.00. Counsel and parties (including self-represented litigants) are encouraged not to personally appear. Anyone who appears in person for the hearing, regardless of vaccination status, must wear a face mask over both the nose and mouth. If no appearance is set up through LACourtConnect/Microsoft Teams, or otherwise, then the Court will assume the parties are submitting on the tentative.
'
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMAMI BURGER VALLI LLC A CA. CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where UMAMI BURGER, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ATTORNEY AT LAW - MARC R. JACOBS ESQ