This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/08/2019 at 16:17:11 (UTC).

ULLUBIY OSMANOV VS DEPENDABLE HIGHWAY EXPRESS INC

Case Summary

On 06/06/2018 ULLUBIY OSMANOV filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEPENDABLE HIGHWAY EXPRESS INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAURA A. SEIGLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****9224

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAURA A. SEIGLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

OSMANOV ULLUBIY

Defendants and Respondents

DEPENDABLE HIGHWAY EXPRESS INC

DOES 1 TO 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

THE SAMMIS LAW FIRM

SAMMIS HARRY WADE

 

Court Documents

Proof of Personal Service

12/5/2019: Proof of Personal Service

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

11/20/2019: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (FINAL STATUS CONFERENCE)

SUMMONS -

6/6/2018: SUMMONS -

COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

6/6/2018: COMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES) -

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/07/2021
  • Hearing06/07/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; : OSC RE Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2020
  • Hearing02/26/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 4B at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Jury Trial - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by Ullubiy Osmanov (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • Docketat 10:00 AM in Department 4B, Laura A. Seigle, Presiding; Final Status Conference - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Final Status Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketSUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ullubiy Osmanov (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2018
  • DocketCOMPLAINT-PERS. INJURY, PROP DAMAGE, WRONGFUL DEATH (2 PAGES)

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC709224    Hearing Date: January 21, 2020    Dept: 27

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE: MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS

On June 6, 2018, plaintiff Ullubiy Osmanov filed this action against defendant Dependable Highway Express, Inc. (“DHE”) for personal injuries sustained in a June 27, 20176 automobile accident. DHE filed this Motion to quash service of summons on the grounds that Plaintiff did not serve DHE’s agent for service of process or other person authorized to accept service. Plaintiff’s proof of service of summons states that Derek Price, General Manager, was a person authorized to accept service process at DHE’s address.

A summons may be served on a corporation by delivering a copy of the summons and complaint: (1) to the person designated as agent for service of process (Code Civ. Proc., § 416.10, subd. (a)); (2) to the president, chief executive officer, or other head of the corporation, a vice president, a secretary or assistant secretary, a treasurer or assistant treasurer, a controller or chief financial officer, a general manager, or a person authorized by the corporation to receive service of process (Code Civ. Proc., § 416.10, subd. (b)); or (3) a method authorized by California Corporations Code sections 1701, 1702, 2110, or 2111 (Code Civ. Proc., § 416.10, subd. (c)). The California Corporations Code authorizes service on any natural person designated as a corporation’s agent, service on the California Secretary of State with a court order authorizing such service, service on a foreign corporation’s officers and general managers in California. (Corp. Code, §§ 1701, 1702, 2110, 2111.)

DHE submits the declaration of Dennis Smith, the director of safety for DHE. His job duties include keeping track of the filing and service of any alleged injury related lawsuits for DHE. (Smith Decl., ¶ 4.) Smith testifies that DHE has not been served with the summons and complaint in this action but was aware of the lawsuit when it was filed in June 2018. (Smith Decl., ¶ 5.) DHE moved to quash when its attorneys reported that a proof of service of summons was filed. (Smith Decl., ¶ 7.) Smith also testifies that DHE does not have a General Manager named Derek Price. (Smith Decl., ¶ 10.) He also authenticates a print out from the California Secretary of State’s website showing that DHE’s agent for service of process is Ron Massman, located at 255 E. Olympic Blvd, Los Angeles. (Smith, Decl. ¶ 11, Ex. B.)

On January 16, 2010, Plaintiff filed a proof of service of summons showing service of the complaint and summons on Ron Massman at 2555 East Olympic Blvd. If DHE desires a continuance of the hearing to address this newly-filed document, the Court will grant a continuance. Otherwise, the Motion to Quash is DENIED, and DHE is to file its response to the complaint within 20 days of the date of this order. Trial is set for September 18, 2020. The FSC is set for September 4, 2020. All dates are based on the new trial date.

Moving party to give notice.

Parties who intend to submit on this tentative must send an email to the Court at SSCDEPT4B@lacourt.org indicating intention to submit on the tentative.