Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/06/2021 at 10:37:12 (UTC).

ULISES ALVAREZ VS COMPLETELY CONCRETE STRUCTURES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2021 ULISES ALVAREZ filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against COMPLETELY CONCRETE STRUCTURES, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4726

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALVAREZ ULISES

Defendants

LEGENDARY STRUCTURES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

JYG CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

CONSTRUCTURE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

COMPLETELY CONCRETE STRUCTURES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ELIHU KAVEH SAM

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/13/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

2/18/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

2/5/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/5/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

2/5/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

2/5/2021: Complaint

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2021
  • Hearing06/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 39 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Ulises Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Ulises Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Ulises Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Ulises Alvarez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JYG CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC. A SUSPENDED CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where LEGENDARY STRUCTURES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where CONSTRUCTURE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where COMPLETELY CONCRETE STRUCTURES A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant