This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/29/2023 at 04:10:58 (UTC).

U&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS REAL PROSPERITY INVESTMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 01/20/2023 U G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against REAL PROSPERITY INVESTMENT, LLC, A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY,. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ARMEN TAMZARIAN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1341

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ARMEN TAMZARIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

U&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

CDMY INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

LA INVESTMENT ADVISORY LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

REAL PROSPERITY INVESTMENT LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAM JUDY MAN-LING

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

1/20/2023: Voluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/20/2023: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

1/20/2023: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

1/20/2023: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

1/20/2023: Unknown - FIRST AMENDED GENERAL ORDER RE: MANDATORY ELECTRONIC FILING

Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

1/20/2023: Unknown - ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION PACKET

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

1/24/2023: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Management Conference

1/27/2023: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

4/13/2023: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/13/2023: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/23/2023

5/23/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 05/23/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

5/23/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2023
  • Hearing07/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2023
  • Hearing07/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 52 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute scheduled for 07/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 05/23/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2023
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Case Management Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52 Held - Continued was rescheduled to 07/21/2023 08:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: U&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: LA INVESTMENT ADVISORY, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Service Cost: 159.48; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2023
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: U&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: REAL PROSPERITY INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 05/23/2023 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 52

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: U&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: REAL PROSPERITY INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); LA INVESTMENT ADVISORY, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); CDMY Investment, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Armen Tamzarian in Department 52 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: U&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: REAL PROSPERITY INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); LA INVESTMENT ADVISORY, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); CDMY Investment, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: U&G CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: REAL PROSPERITY INVESTMENT, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); LA INVESTMENT ADVISORY, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant); CDMY Investment, LLC, a California limited liability company (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketAlternate Dispute Resolution Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketFirst Amended General Order re: Mandatory Electronic Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketVoluntary Efficient Litigation Stipulation Packet; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less