This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/08/2020 at 02:45:58 (UTC).

UDEH, FRANCIS VS UDEH, EMILIA OLUCHUK

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 UDEH, FRANCIS filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against UDEH, EMILIA OLUCHUK. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Compton Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0187

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Compton Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

UDEH FRANCIS

Respondent

UDEH EMILIA OLUCHUK

 

Court Documents

Declaration - Separate Property

4/2/2020: Declaration - Separate Property

Declaration - Income and Expense

4/2/2020: Declaration - Income and Expense

Declaration - UCCJEA

4/2/2020: Declaration - UCCJEA

Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

4/2/2020: Family Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020

Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

4/2/2020: Declaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property

Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

4/2/2020: Petition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child

Summons

4/2/2020: Summons

Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

4/6/2020: Fee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Order on Court Fee Waiver - Granted FW003; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketSummons; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Separate Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketFee Waiver - Request - Waive Court Fees - Filed FW001; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Community and Quasi-Community Property; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - UCCJEA; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketPetition - Dissolution w/ Minor Child; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketDeclaration - Income and Expense; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketFamily Law Case Cover Sheet - FAM-020; Filed by Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.