This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/18/2020 at 06:05:47 (UTC).

U. S. FOODS, A CORPORATION VS CITRUS CITY MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 U S FOODS, A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITRUS CITY MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9655

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U. S. FOODS A CORPORATION FKA U.S. FOODSERVICE INC. A CORPORATION

U. S. FOODS FKA U.S. FOODSERVICE INC.

Defendants

AMADOUBA TALL

CITRUS CITY MANAGEMENT COMPANY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CITRUS CITY GRILLE CORONA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARWACKI JR. RAY

GARWACKI JR. RAY ESQ.

GARWACKI RAY JR.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/4/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/20/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

1/13/2020: Notice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/21/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/21/2020

2/21/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 02/21/2020

Request for Dismissal

3/11/2020: Request for Dismissal

Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAY GARWACKI, JR. IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

3/11/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION OF RAY GARWACKI, JR. IN RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketDeclaration (of Ray Garwacki, Jr. in Response to Order to Show Cause); Filed by U. S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by U. S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 76; Case Management Conference - Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for ((Case Management Conference) of 02/21/2020); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Reassignment and Order for Plaintiff to Give Notice; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U. S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U. S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where US Foodservice Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARWACKI JR. RAY