This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/26/2019 at 16:28:01 (UTC).

U. S. FOODS, A CORPORATION FKA U.S. FOODSERVICE INC., A CORPORATION VS TANGO HOSPITALITY LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2019 U S FOODS, A CORPORATION FKA U S FOODSERVICE INC , A CORPORATION filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TANGO HOSPITALITY LLC, A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9579

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

U. S. FOODS A CORPORATION FKA U.S. FOODSERVICE INC. A CORPORATION

U. S. FOODS FKA U.S. FOODSERVICE INC. A CORPORATION

Defendants

HALL JIM

TANGO HOSPITALITY LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY DBA CAFE TU TU TANGO

TANGO HOSPITALITY LLC DBA CAFE TU TU TANGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GARWACKI JR. RAY

GARWACKI RAY JR.

 

Court Documents

Complaint

11/4/2019: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

11/4/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/4/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

11/4/2019: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

11/20/2019: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

11/20/2019: Notice of Case Management Conference

Proof of Personal Service

11/20/2019: Proof of Personal Service

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/05/2020
  • Hearing03/05/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • Hearing01/06/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 72 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by U. S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by U. S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U. S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U. S. Foods (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US FOODS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where US Foodservice Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARWACKI JR. RAY