Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/09/2019 at 06:04:54 (UTC).

U S BANK NATIONAL TRUST N A VS GARY B SMITH ET AL

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 U S BANK NATIONAL TRUST N A filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GARY B SMITH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0271

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

U.S. BANK NAITONAL TRUST N.A.

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants and Respondents

SMITH GARY B.

DOES 1 - 100

SMITH DONNA RAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

SARNI MARK J. ESQ.

MCCARTHY & HOLTHUS LLP

COUTTS MELISSA ROBBINS

DUPLANTIER ANGELO A

 

Court Documents

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

2/9/2018: AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

2/9/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

2/23/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order

2/26/2018: Minute Order

Minute Order

3/5/2018: Minute Order

DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

4/30/2018: DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

5/10/2018: APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

Proof of Service

5/10/2018: Proof of Service

NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/18/2018: NOTICE OF CONTINUED CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Proof of Service

5/18/2018: Proof of Service

Request for Dismissal

6/18/2018: Request for Dismissal

AMENDED APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

6/19/2018: AMENDED APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

6/25/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

7/17/2018: NOTICE OF REJECTION APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDANT GARY B. SMITH

8/2/2018: DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF AMENDED APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION OF SUMMONS AS TO DEFENDANT GARY B. SMITH

AMENDED APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

8/2/2018: AMENDED APPLICATION FOR PUBLICATION

Association of Attorney

4/18/2019: Association of Attorney

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGFMENT CONFERENCE

11/7/2017: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGFMENT CONFERENCE

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • Complaint (1st); Filed by U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff); Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Summons (on Complaint); Filed by U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff); Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • Amended Complaint ((1st)); Filed by U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff); U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff); Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Association of Attorney; Filed by U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • Clerk of Court Notice of Clerical Error and Correction; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • Notice of Change of Address or Other Contact Information; Filed by Melissa Robbins Coutts (Attorney)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • Request for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • AMENDED ORDER FOR PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
67 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2018
  • DECLARATION OF DILIGENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF PENDENCY OF ACTION [LIS PENDENS -C.C.P. 405.22]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice; Filed by U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • Substitution of Attorney; Filed by U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGFMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • COMPLAINT FOR: 1) REFORMATION OF DEED OF TRUST; AND, ETC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • Complaint; Filed by U.S. Bank Naitonal Trust, N.A. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: BC680271    Hearing Date: September 24, 2020    Dept: 50

 

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

lakeview loan servicing, llc,

Plaintiff,

vs.

gary b. smith, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

BC 680271

Hearing Date:

September 24, 2020

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

[TENTATIVE] ORDER RE:

PLAINTIFF’S REQUEST FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

Plaintiff Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC (“Plaintiff”) requests entry of default judgment against Defendants Gary B. Smith and Donna Ray Smith.

The Court grants Plaintiff’s request for judicial notice as to Exhibits 1-12.

The Court finds that Plaintiff has sufficiently supported its request for default judgment with the submitted declarations and evidence. However, the proposed Judgment submitted by Plaintiff includes an order to the Recorder’s Office of Orange County to accept, file and record a certified copy of the Judgment along with the attached exhibits. It appears that this is an error since the Deed of Trust at issue was filed originally in the Los Angeles County Recorder’s Office. Plaintiff may submit a corrected and revised proposed Judgment to the Court, with a conformed courtesy copy delivered to the Clerk in Department 50. Since the proposed Judgment

is being revised, the word “Defendant” on line 24 of page 1 of the Judgment also should be changed to “Defendants,” and the signature line should be the same as the signature line below.

DATED: September 24, 2020 ________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U S BANK NATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SARNI, MARK J