This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/16/2019 at 02:43:26 (UTC).

U HAUL CO OF CALIFORNIA ET AL VS MANUK MOVSESYAN ET AL

Case Summary

On 03/06/2018 U HAUL CO OF CALIFORNIA filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against MANUK MOVSESYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****6356

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

ARCOA RISK RETENTION GROUP INC.

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA

REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY

U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA

Defendants and Respondents

SATUR MICHELLE

KIRAKOSYAN ARMIK

HOVHANNISYAN GOHARIK

TSATUR RICHARD

MOVSESYAN MANUK

DOES 1-20

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

TSATURYAN ARMAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

LAPIDUS DANIEL C. ESQ.

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

INGULSRUD KRISTIN A. ESQ

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

5/7/2018: REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/19/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

6/19/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

7/3/2018: DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

7/3/2018: NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES

CIVIL DEPOSIT

7/3/2018: CIVIL DEPOSIT

Minute Order

7/5/2018: Minute Order

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

8/10/2018: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

8/23/2018: NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT ARMIK KIRAKOSYAN

4/12/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT ARMIK KIRAKOSYAN

ANSWER OF GOHARIK HOVHANNISYAN; ARMIK KIRAKOSYAN; MICHELLE SATUR; RICHARD TSATUR, A.K.A. ARMAN TSATURYAN; AND GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

4/6/2018: ANSWER OF GOHARIK HOVHANNISYAN; ARMIK KIRAKOSYAN; MICHELLE SATUR; RICHARD TSATUR, A.K.A. ARMAN TSATURYAN; AND GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY TO COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

3/15/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT RICHARD TSATUR, A.K.A. ARMAN TSATURYAN

3/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT RICHARD TSATUR, A.K.A. ARMAN TSATURYAN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MICHELLE SATUR

3/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MICHELLE SATUR

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT GOHARIK HOVHANNISYAN

3/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT GOHARIK HOVHANNISYAN

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MANUK MOVSESYAN

3/21/2018: PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT MANUK MOVSESYAN

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

3/6/2018: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

3/8/2018: NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • at 08:30 AM in Department 56; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Dismissal & P/S; Filed by U-Haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-Haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by U-Haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-Haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • at 08:31 AM in Department 56; Case Management Conference (Conference-Case Management; Trial Date Set) -

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Minute order entered: 2018-07-05 00:00:00; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Demand for Jury Trial; Filed by Goharik Hovhannisyan (Defendant); Armik Kirakosyan (Defendant); Michelle Satur (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • Notice; Filed by Goharik Hovhannisyan (Defendant); Armik Kirakosyan (Defendant); Michelle Satur (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2018
  • Proof-Service/Summons; Filed by U-Haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-Haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON DEFENDANT GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint); Filed by U-Haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-Haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • Notice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2018
  • OSC-Failure to File Proof of Serv; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by U-Haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-Haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less

Complaint Information

DANIEL C. LAPIDUS (Bar No. 227170) Email: dan@lapidusiaw.com CHRISTO R M. LAPIDUS (Bar No. 316005)

Email: christopher@]lapiduslaw.com LAPIDUS & EAP %U% Superiogg)%g:f?alifornia A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION Countv of Las Angeles

177 SOUTH BEVERLY DRIV

EVERLY HILLS, CALIFORNIA 90212 APR 12 2016 TEL: 310-550-870 ’ FAX:310-943-2471 Sherri R. Carger, txecutive Officer/Clerk of Court

Attorneys for Plaintiffs By h' S ~Deputy U-Haul Co. of California, U-Haul Co. of Arizona, Sanche Repwest Insurance Company and ARCOA Risk Retention Group, Inc.

SUPERIOR COURT OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA FOR THE COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA,a | CASE NO.: BC696356 California corporation; REPWEST

: PROOF OF SERVICE OF INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ON corporation; U-HAUL CO. OF DEFENDANT ARMIK ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation; KIRAKOSYAN

ARCOA RISK RETENTION GROUP, INC., a Nevada corporation,

Judge: Hon. Holly J. Fujie Plaintiffs, Department: 56 Vs. Complaint Filed: March 6, 2018

Trial Date: None set MANUK MOVSESYAN, an

individual; GOHARIK HOVHANNISY AN, an individual; ARMIK KIRAKOSY AN, an individual; MICHELLE SATUR, an individual;

RICHARD TSATUR, a.k.a. ARMAN R A TSATURYAN, an individual; ECEIVED

GOVERNMENT EMPLOYEES APR 12 2018

INSURANCE COMPANY, a Maryland Fif

corporation; and DOES 1-20, LING W’NDOW

Defendants.