This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/22/2020 at 05:11:34 (UTC).

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, A CORPORATION, ET AL. VS SOL KWON, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 06/30/2020 U-HAUL CO OF CALIFORNIA, A CORPORATION filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against SOL KWON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4573

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA A CORPORATION

ARCOA RISK RETENTION GROUP INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA AN ARIZONA CORPORATION

REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY AN ARIZONA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Defendants

DOES 1 THROUGH 20

MOYAL ABRAHAM

KWON SOL

THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION AN OHIO CORPORATION

THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION

U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA AN ARIZONA CORPORATION

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

THE PROGRESSIVE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAPIDUS DANIEL C

Defendant Attorney

HOWE PATRICK

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal

10/13/2020: Request for Dismissal

Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

10/19/2020: Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service

Notice of Ruling

10/7/2020: Notice of Ruling

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

10/7/2020: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE; CAS...)

Request for Dismissal

10/7/2020: Request for Dismissal

Case Management Statement

9/22/2020: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/27/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

8/27/2020: Cross-Complaint

Answer

8/27/2020: Answer

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

8/13/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/20/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

7/31/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Personal Service

7/13/2020: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/13/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

7/13/2020: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/30/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

6/30/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

6/30/2020: Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service; Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (With prejudice, entire action); Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 40; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal (Without prejudice, complaint as to defendants Sol Kwon and Abraham Moyal Only.); Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service; Cas...)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by Progressive West Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation Erroneously Sued As The Progressive Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Progressive West Insurance Company, an Ohio corporation Erroneously Sued As The Progressive Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, a Corporation (Plaintiff); REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff); U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA, an Arizona corporation (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY AN ARIZONA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCOA RISK RETENTION GROUP INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE is a litigant