Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/06/2021 at 09:30:13 (UTC).

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, ET AL. VS ALEXANDRE FARDELLONE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 U-HAUL CO OF CALIFORNIA, A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against ALEXANDRE FARDELLONE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is BARBARA M. SCHEPER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7008

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

BARBARA M. SCHEPER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA AN ARIZONA CORPORATION

REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY AN ARIZONA CORPORATION

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA

REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY

U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA

ARCOA RISK RETENTION GROUP INC.

Defendants and Cross Defendants

MARVISI DAVID

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

FARDELLONE ALEXANDRE

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

U-HAUL CO. OF CALIFORNIA

REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY

U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA

ARCOA RISK RETENTION GROUP INC.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAPIDUS DANIEL C

LAPIDUS DANIEL C ESQ.

PARKER MICHAEL R.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

BRUGGE ROBERT D.

LANDVER ALINA

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LANDVER ALINA

LAPIDUS DANIEL C ESQ.

 

Court Documents

Substitution of Attorney

5/25/2021: Substitution of Attorney

Case Management Statement

5/21/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

4/26/2021: Case Management Statement

Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

5/13/2021: Notice - NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION:)

4/19/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (COURT ORDER RE STIPULATION:)

Answer

4/20/2021: Answer

Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT

4/1/2021: Notice - NOTICE NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING OF MOTION OF PLAINTIFFS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

3/25/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR [NOTICE OF REJECTION OF ELECTRONIC FILING]

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

3/3/2021: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

3/4/2021: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. LAPIDUS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

1/13/2021: Declaration - DECLARATION OF DANIEL C. LAPIDUS IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT

Answer

9/24/2020: Answer

Answer

10/5/2020: Answer

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/1/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/24/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/23/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/17/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

7/17/2020: Complaint

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • Hearing07/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • Hearing07/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 30 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Vacate (Motion to Vacate Default) - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by U-haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by Arcoa Risk Retention Group Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSubstitution of Attorney; Filed by U-haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by U-haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 30, Barbara M. Scheper, Presiding; Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment - Not Held - Rescheduled by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 09/01/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by U-haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by U-haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketNotice (of Case Management Conference); Filed by U-haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by U-haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by U-haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by U-haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by U-haul Co. Of California (Plaintiff); Repwest Insurance Company (Plaintiff); U-haul Co. Of Arizona (Plaintiff) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY AN ARIZONA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCOA RISK RETENTION GROUP INC. A NEVADA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where REPWEST INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where U-HAUL CO. OF ARIZONA INC. is a litigant