This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/08/2022 at 16:10:22 (UTC).

TZIPPY CARE, INC. VS CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Case Summary

On 07/22/2021 TZIPPY CARE, INC filed an Other lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7004

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MAUREEN DUFFY-LEWIS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TZIPPY CARE INC. DBA WESTERN CONVALESCENT HOSPITAL

Defendant

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DHARWADKAR SHILPA R.

Defendant Attorney

EDELSTEIN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

7/26/2021: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

7/22/2021: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

7/22/2021: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

7/22/2021: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/22/2021: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/10/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

General Denial

9/24/2021: General Denial

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

12/1/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Case Management Order

12/1/2021: Case Management Order

Case Management Statement

11/16/2021: Case Management Statement

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2023
  • Hearing06/12/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2023
  • Hearing06/02/2023 at 09:30 AM in Department 38 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 38, Maureen Duffy-Lewis, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketCase Management Order; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by Tzippy Care, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketGeneral Denial; Filed by California Department Of Public Health (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Tzippy Care, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tzippy Care, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tzippy Care, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tzippy Care, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TZIPPY CARE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DHARWADKAR SHILPA R.