Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/26/2021 at 03:23:56 (UTC).

TYSON YEE VS SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, AN EDISON INTERNATIONAL COMPANY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/28/2020 TYSON YEE filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON, AN EDISON INTERNATIONAL COMPANY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RUPERT A. BYRDSONG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7071

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

RUPERT A. BYRDSONG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

YEE TYSON

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

MOWBRAY'S TREE SERVICE

SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON AN EDISON INTERNATIONAL COMPANY

Cross Defendants

ROES 1-100 INCLUSIVE

ARBORWORKS INC

ARBORWORKS INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHAPIRO MICHAEL RICHARD

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

LAWLESS KEVIN

O'BRIEN PATRICK KEVIN

 

Court Documents

Answer - ANSWER OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

11/16/2020: Answer - ANSWER OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

Cross-Complaint

11/16/2020: Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

3/2/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Request for Dismissal

3/2/2021: Request for Dismissal

Proof of Service by Mail

2/16/2021: Proof of Service by Mail

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

2/8/2021: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (HEARING ON MOTION TO TRANSFER; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

Notice of Ruling

1/27/2021: Notice of Ruling

Case Management Statement

1/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Case Management Statement

1/11/2021: Case Management Statement

Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

12/30/2020: Summons - SUMMONS CROSS-COMPLAINT

Memorandum of Points & Authorities

12/31/2020: Memorandum of Points & Authorities

Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

12/31/2020: Declaration - DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/13/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Notice of Case Management Conference

10/8/2020: Notice of Case Management Conference

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

9/28/2020: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

9/28/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Complaint

9/28/2020: Complaint

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • Hearing06/06/2022 at 09:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • Hearing05/27/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department 28 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Final Status Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Hearing on Motion to Transfer - Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docketat 1:30 PM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Non-Appearance Case Review (Adam Dubin) - Not Held - Vacated by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketMinute Order ( (Case Management Conference)); Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mowbray's Tree Service (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by Mowbray's Tree Service (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by Mowbray's Tree Service (Cross-Complainant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2021
  • Docketat 08:30 AM in Department 28, Rupert A. Byrdsong, Presiding; Case Management Conference - Held - Continued

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by Southern California Edison, an Edison International Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAnswer (Of Southern California Edison Company To Plaintiff?s Complaint); Filed by Southern California Edison, an Edison International Company (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Tyson Yee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by Tyson Yee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketNotice of Ruling; Filed by Tyson Yee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by Tyson Yee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by Tyson Yee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketSummons (on Complaint); Filed by Tyson Yee (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOWBRAY'S TREE SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases where ARBORWORKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA EDISON COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SHAPIRO MICHAEL RICHARD