This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 01/20/2023 at 15:54:40 (UTC).

TYSON & MENDES LLP VS AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES INC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 TYSON MENDES LLP filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MICHAEL P. VICENCIA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0409

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

MICHAEL P. VICENCIA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TYSON & MENDES LLP

Defendant

AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GREBING CHARLES

Defendant Attorney

YARBROUGH ADAM JOSEPH

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Management Conference

8/18/2022: Notice of Case Management Conference

Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

8/18/2022: Order to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

8/15/2022: Notice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case

Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

8/15/2022: Summons - SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT

Complaint

8/15/2022: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

8/15/2022: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

8/26/2022: Proof of Mailing (Substituted Service)

Answer

10/20/2022: Answer

Case Management Statement

12/29/2022: Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/17/2023

1/17/2023: Certificate of Mailing for - CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE) OF 01/17/2023

Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

1/17/2023: Minute Order - MINUTE ORDER (CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2023
  • Hearing11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Jury Trial

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2023
  • Hearing11/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S26 at 275 Magnolia, Long Beach, CA 90802; Final Status Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer of Defendant American University of Health Sciences, Inc. to Plaintiffl's Complaint: Name Extension: of Defendant American University of Health Sciences, Inc. to Plaintiffl's Complaint ; As To Parties changed from Tyson & Mendes LLP (Plaintiff) to Tyson & Mendes LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketUpdated -- Answer of Defendant American University of Health Sciences, Inc. to Plaintiffl's Complaint: As To Parties changed from Tyson & Mendes LLP (Plaintiff) to Tyson & Mendes LLP (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketFinal Status Conference scheduled for 11/03/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketJury Trial scheduled for 11/13/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketMinute Order (Case Management Conference)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Case Management Conference) of 01/17/2023; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26 updated: Result Date to 01/17/2023; Result Type to Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCase Management Statement; Filed by: American University of Health Sciences Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Tyson & Mendes LLP (Plaintiff); As to: American University of Health Sciences Inc (Defendant); Mailing Date: 08/26/2022; Service Cost: 105.90; Cost Waived: No; Proof of Mailing Date: 08/26/2022; Service Cost Waived: No

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/01/2022 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCase Management Conference scheduled for 01/17/2023 at 08:30 AM in Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse at Department S26

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Management Conference; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Failure to File Proof of Service; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Michael P. Vicencia in Department S26 Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Tyson & Mendes LLP (Plaintiff); As to: American University of Health Sciences Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Tyson & Mendes LLP (Plaintiff); As to: American University of Health Sciences Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Tyson & Mendes LLP (Plaintiff); As to: American University of Health Sciences Inc (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Unlimited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN UNIVERSITY OF HEALTH SCIENCES is a litigant

Latest cases where Tyson & Mendes LLP is a litigant